Trakhter et al v USA
Plaintiff: Natalya Malakhova and Lenny Trakhter
Defendant: United State of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv06749
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The Motion Hearing as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction noticed for 12/31/2021 is continued to 1/7/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #7 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United State of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/31/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 12/8/2020. Replies due by 12/15/2020. (Petrila, James) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Natalya Malakhova, Lenny Trakhter re #5 Summons Issued (Ford, Andrew) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United State of America. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Ford, Andrew) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. File as "Proposed Summons." Re: #2 Complaint filed by Lenny Trakhter, Natalya M alakhova (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore COMPLAINT Summons in a Civil Action against United State of America. Filed byLenny Trakhter, Natalya Malakhova. (Ford, Andrew) (Filed on 9/28/2020) Modified on 9/29/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United State of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14995215.). Filed byLenny Trakhter, Natalya Malakhova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ford, Andrew) (Filed on 9/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trakhter et al v USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalya Malakhova
Represented By: Andrew Arnold Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenny Trakhter
Represented By: Andrew Arnold Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America
Represented By: James J Petrila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?