Google LLC v. Sonos, Inc.
Plaintiff: Google LLC
Defendant: Sonos, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06754
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 38 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/2020 before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, RMR, CRR, CCRR, CRG, CCG, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #35 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2021. (Related documents(s) #35 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11-19-2020 before Judge William Alsup by Sonos, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Caridis, Alyssa) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER STAYING CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Cooper, Lindsay) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Initial Case Management Conference terminated. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2020 by AT&T Conference line re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer to the Western District of Texas filed by Sonos, Inc. The Court heard oral arguments and took the motion under submission. Initial Case Management Conference not held. Total Time in Court: 39 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Charles Verhoeven / Lindsay Cooper / Melissa Baily. Defendant Attorney: Alyssa Caridis / Clement Roberts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 33 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer to the Western District of Texas ) in Support of it's Motion to Dismiss filed bySonos, Inc.. (Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cooper, Lindsay) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (de Blank, Bas) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google LLC re #27 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Sonos' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer to the Western District of Texas ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel S. Friedland ISO Google's Opposition (Redacted), #2 Declaration of James Judah ISO Google's Opposition (Redacted), #3 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Google's Opposition, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13 (Redacted), #17 Exhibit 14 (Redacted), #18 Exhibit 15 (Redacted), #19 Exhibit 16 (Redacted), #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 27 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Sonos' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Google's AMTFUS, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Google's Opposition to Sonos' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #4 Sealed Version of Google's Opposition to Sonos' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #5 Redacted Version of the Declaration of Daniel S. Friedland ISO Google's Opposition, #6 Sealed Version of the Declaration of Daniel S. Friedland ISO Google's Opposition, #7 Redacted Version of the Declaration of James Judah ISO Google's Opposition, #8 Sealed Version of the Declaration of James Judah ISO Google's Opposition, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, #10 Sealed Version of Exhibit 13, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #12 Sealed Version of Exhibit 14, #13 Sealed Version of Exhibit 15, #14 Sealed Version of Exhibit 16)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to #25 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer to the Western District of Texas, Motion Hearing as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer to the Western District of Texas set for 11/19/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 is advanced to 11/19/2020 at 08:00 AM to be held in conjunction with the Motion Hearing. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #11 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 25 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer to the Western District of Texas November 19, 2020 filed bySonos, Inc.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 9:30 AM is continued to 1/21/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. All pending motions will be taken offcalendar and must be renoticed by the moving party for a new hearing date on a Thursday at 08:00 AM. The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the renotice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 73. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/22/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Cooper (Cooper, Lindsay) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Ross Jaffe (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa J Baily (Baily, Melissa) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Kramer Verhoeven (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sonos, Inc... (de Blank, Bas) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE: Case 20-cv-03845-EMC, Google LLC v. Sonos, Inc., not related. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa M. Caridis PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 5-1(c)(2) (Caridis, Alyssa) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bas de Blank (de Blank, Bas) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/20/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer to the Western District of Texas filed by Sonos, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/26/2020. Replies due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alyssa Caridis with Exhibits A - Z, #2 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sonos, Inc. has no parent corporation. (Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/31/2020 is reset to 1/21/2021 at 9:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. b> Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google LLC. Sonos, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patents (U.S. Patent No. 9,967,615; U.S. Patent No. 10,779,033; U.S. Patent No. 9,344,206; U.S. Patent No. 10,469,966; and U.S. Patent No. 9,219,460) (cc: form mailed to register). (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/31/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sonos, Inc. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER to Counsel - submit missing documents: Counsel is reminded to docket the AO Patent form Report On Filing Of Action Regarding Patent Or T rademark using ECF event Patent/Trademark Report. The form can be found on our civil forms webpage. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/13/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google LLC. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sonos, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14997177.). Filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pak, Sean) (Filed on 9/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google LLC v. Sonos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonos, Inc.
Represented By: Bas de Blank
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Represented By: Alyssa M. Caridis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google LLC
Represented By: Sean Sang-Chul Pak
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Jordan Ross Jaffe
Represented By: Melissa J Baily
Represented By: Lindsay Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?