State of California et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives et al
Plaintiff: Frank Blackwell, Bryan Muehlberger, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence and State of California
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Acting Deputy Direct Regina Lombardo, Attorney General William P. Barr, Chief, Firearms Tech Michael R Curtis, Michael R Curtis, Regina Lombardo, William P. Barr and United States Department of Justice
Intervenor: Zachary Fort, Frederick Barton, BlackHawk Manufacturing Group, Inc. and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06761
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION FOR HEARING: Motion Hearing re: #24 MOTION to Intervene set for 1/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing deadlines remain unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. (Lee, George) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BlackHawk Manufacturing Group, Inc. (Lee, George) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Zachary Fort, Frederick Barton, BlackHawk Manufacturing Group, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. Responses due by 12/8/2020. Replies due by 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Zachary Fort, #3 Declaration of Frederick Barton, #4 Declaration of Tilden Smith, #5 Declaration of Brandon Combs, #6 Proposed Answer, #7 Proposed Order)(Lee, George) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 09:30 AM by Videoconference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger, State of California.. (Gopalan, Vivek) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15045557.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Skaggs, John) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #2 Flattened PDF) (elyS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger re #10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Avi Weitzman) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999062.), #11 Summons Issued as to USA, #7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Liesel Schapira) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999476.), #1 Complaint,, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Lee Crain) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999178.), #6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Kaylie Springer) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999435.), 9 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Gopalan, Vivek) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Elizabeth Shearer (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, Michael R Curtis, Regina Lombardo, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Regina Lombardo, #2 Michael R. Curtis, #3 Department of Justice, #4 William Barr)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/31/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/14/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Matthew Wise (Wise, R.) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Liesel Schapira) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999476.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schapira, Liesel) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Kaylie Springer) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999435.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Springer, Kaylie) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Lee Crain) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999178.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crain, Lee) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Avi Weitzman) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999062.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weitzman, Avi) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger (Other than the named parties, there is no such interest to report.) (Gopalan, Vivek) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger (Giffords Law Center has no parent corporation or publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock.) (Gopalan, Vivek) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14998646.). Filed byFrank Blackwell, Bryan Muehlberger, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons)(Gopalan, Vivek) (Filed on 9/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Blackwell
Represented By: Avi Weitzman
Represented By: Liesel Schapira
Represented By: Lee Crain
Represented By: Kaylie L Springer
Represented By: Vivek R Gopalan
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Shearer
Represented By: John Adam Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Muehlberger
Represented By: Avi Weitzman
Represented By: Liesel Schapira
Represented By: Lee Crain
Represented By: Kaylie L Springer
Represented By: Vivek R Gopalan
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Shearer
Represented By: John Adam Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Avi Weitzman
Represented By: Liesel Schapira
Represented By: Lee Crain
Represented By: Kaylie L Springer
Represented By: Vivek R Gopalan
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Shearer
Represented By: John Adam Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Deputy Direct Regina Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief, Firearms Tech Michael R Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Zachary Fort
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Frederick Barton
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BlackHawk Manufacturing Group, Inc.
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?