Desert Survivors, et al v United States Department of the Interior, et al
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Center For Biological Diversity and Desert Survivors
Defendant: United States Department of Interior and United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Case Number: 3:2020cv06787
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 Refund Status re #12 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15000998 Updated Application for Refund by Center For Biological Diversity, Desert Survivors, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 Refund Status re #10 Application for Refund Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15000998 (Duplicate charge) by Center For Biological Diversity, Desert Survivors, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Desert Survivors, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians.. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States Fish And Wildlife Service. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Interior. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/14/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity, Desert Survivors, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-15001089.). Filed by Desert Survivors, WildEarth Guardians, Center For Biological Diversity, Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sivas, Deborah) (Filed on 9/29/2020) Modified on 10/5/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Survivors, et al v United States Department of the Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Survivors
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?