Zeff v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: Zachary Zeff
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv07122
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zachary Zeff re #15 Case Management Scheduling Order, Standing Order for All Judges, Civil Standing Order (General), and Civil Standing Order (Discovery) (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/21/2020. Replies due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice [Exhibit A], #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Non-Party Interested Entities, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rackers, Mark) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2021.Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/7/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC.. (Rackers, Mark) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE. An order from the Court is not required to extend the time to respond to the complaint pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a). Docket entries #8 and #10 are terminated as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSE TO DECEMBER 7, 2020 WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC and Zachery Zeff (Rackers, Mark) (Filed on 11/18/2020) Modified on 11/19/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/24/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application re #1 Complaint, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mark G. Rackers ISO Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Re: Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Re: Declaration of Mark G. Rackers ISO Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Freeling, Melissa) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zachary Zeff.. (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary Zeff. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/29/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Class Action) against Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15057414.). Filed byZachary Zeff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 10/13/2020) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeff v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Zeff
Represented By: Alex Michael Tomasevic
Represented By: Craig McKenzie Nicholas
Represented By: Ethan Thomas Litney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Represented By: Mark Gerard Rackers
Represented By: Melissa Ann Freeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?