San Francisco Baykeeper v. Allied Engineering and Production Corporation et al
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: Stone Boatyard, LLC, Allied Land Company and Allied Engineering and Production Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv07123
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Stone Boatyard, LLC (Hartman, M.) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 Stone Boatyard, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint, and CROSSCLAIM against Allied Engineering and Production Corporation, Allied Land Company byStone Boatyard, LLC. (Hartman, M.) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allied Engineering and Production Corporation, Allied Land Company. (Infelise, Robert) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. At the joint request of plaintiff and defendant Stone Boatyard, LLC (Stone), Dkt. No. #14 , Stone's answer to the complaint may be filed and served by December 8, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/24/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PER L.R. 6-1(B) AND 6-2 TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT STONE BOATYARD, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Stone Boatyard, LLC. (Termyn, Christian) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Allied Land Company and Allied Engineering & Production Corporation to Respond to re #1 Complaint filed by Allied Engineering and Production Corporation, Allied Land Company. (Infelise, Robert) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Stone Boatyard, LLC served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Flanders, Jason) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Allied Land Company served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Flanders, Jason) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Allied Engineering and Production Corporation served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Flanders, Jason) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM Before Judge James Donato. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/29/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Baykeeper.. (Flanders, Jason) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allied Engineering and Production Corporation, Allied Land Company, and Stone Boatyard, LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/27/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Flanders, Jason) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Engineering and Production Corporation, Allied Land Company, Stone Boatyard, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15057529.). Filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - 20 06 10 NOI, #2 Exhibit Ex B - 20 07 10 NOI, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Notice to AG, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flanders, Jason) (Filed on 10/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. Allied Engineering and Production Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Boatyard, LLC
Represented By: Christian William Termyn
Represented By: M. Ray Hartman, III
Represented By: Laura Godfrey Zagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Land Company
Represented By: Robert Donald Infelise
Represented By: Robert P. Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Engineering and Production Corporation
Represented By: Robert Donald Infelise
Represented By: Robert P. Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Represented By: Nicole Chiyeko Sasaki
Represented By: Erica A Maharg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?