Meta Platforms, Inc. v. BrandTotal Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc. and Meta Platforms, Inc.
Defendant: BrandTotal Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv07182
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2022 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2022)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Order. Signed 9/30/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #378 Stipulation for Permanent Injunction and Dismissal.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2022)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 9/30/2022. Permanent Injunction to issue. Court denies pending Daubert motion without prejudice. Parties to submit a proposed order of voluntary dismissal. (Not Reported). Total Time in Court 2 minutes. Plaintiff's Attorney: Ari Holtzblatt. Defendants' Attorney: Dustin Taylor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2022)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Permanent Injunction and Dismissal filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., BrandTotal, Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/30/2022) Modified on 10/3/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. and BrandTotal, Ltd and Unimania, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 9/23/2022) Modified on 9/26/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/9/2022. All pretrial and trial filing deadlines, including any motions, for the final pretrial conference are suspended through 9/30/2022. The hearing date on the Motion for Permanent Injunction set for 9/30/2022 at 2:00 PM is VACATED and subject to being re-set. Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held by Zoom Webinar.Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Ari Holtzblatt, Sonal MehtaAttorney for Defendant: Dustin Taylor(klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Order. Signed 9/2/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #374 Stipulation Continuing Case Mgmt Conference and Pretrial Deadlines.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing re #375 Order on Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 9/9/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings h eld by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference and Pretrial Deadlines and Proposed Order filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. BrandTotal, Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 9/1/2022) Modified on 9/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Order. Signed 8/31/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #370 Stipulation Extending Time To Respond to Meta's Injunction Motion #367 and Fees Motion #368 and Mooting BrandTotal's Motion to Enlarge #369 .(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order See Order #373 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #367 Notice of Motion and Motion for Permanent Injunction , #368 Notice of Motion and for Attorney Fees . BrandTotal's Opposition/ Responses due by 9/9/2022. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER to address trial deadlines at case management conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 30, 2022. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/30/2022. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Meta's Injunction Motion (ECF No. 367) and Fees Motion (ECF No. 368) and Mooting BrandTotal's Motion to Enlarge (ECF No. 369) with Proposed Order filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., BrandTotal, Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 8/30/2022) Modified on 8/30/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Opposed Motion to Enlarge Time to File Response/Reply as to #368 Notice of Motion and for Attorney Fees , #367 Notice of Motion and Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of K. Fussner, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Time)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 8/26/2022) Modified on 8/29/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 8/31/2022. Replies due by 9/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal Mehta in Support, #2 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support, #3 Declaration of Allison Schultz in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support, #10 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/17/2022) Modified on 8/18/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Notice of Motion and Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 8/31/2022. Replies due by 9/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/17/2022) Modified on 8/18/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Order. Signed 7/5/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #365 Stipulation For An Order Awarding Fees.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Stipulated request for and Order Awarding Fees with Proposed Order filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 7/1/2022) Modified on 7/5/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MGMT CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2022 has been continued to 9/2/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. No case management statement needs to be filed. Parties can provide an oral update.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in t he argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 8/31/2022 by 3:00 PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Order. Signed 6/28/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #362 Stipulation Extending Mediation Date.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STIPULATION Extending Mediation Date with Proposed Order filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., BrandTotal, Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support Thereto)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 6/27/2022) Modified on 6/28/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Brief re #314 Reply to Opposition/Response, Public Reply filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit KK)(Related document(s) #314 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Brief re #301 Reply to Opposition/Response, Redacted Public Version of Reply filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #301 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Brief re #299 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, Redacted Public Version of Opposition/Response filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Redacted Exhibit C, #4 Redacted Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H Placeholder, #8 Redacted Exhibit I, #9 Redacted Exhibit J, #10 Redacted Exhibit K, #11 Redacted Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit P Placeholder, #13 Exhibit Q Placeholder, #14 Exhibit S Placeholder, #15 Exhibit T Placeholder, #16 Exhibit W Placeholder, #17 Exhibit X, #18 Exhibit Y, #19 Exhibit Z, #20 Exhibit AA, #21 Exhibit BB Placeholder, #22 Exhibit CC Placeholder)(Related document(s) #299 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Brief re #288 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Redacted Public Version of Opposition/Response filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Declaration of Y. Regev, #2 Redacted Exhibit A, #3 Redacted Exhibit B, #4 Redacted Exhibit C, #5 Redacted Exhibit D, #6 Redacted Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F Placeholder, #8 Redacted Exhibit H, #9 Redacted Exhibit I, #10 Redacted Exhibit L, #11 Redacted Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #288 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Redacted Public Version re #279 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #279 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/24/2022) Modified on 6/27/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Redacted Public Versions re #267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents to BrandTotal's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Redacted Public Versions filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Redacted Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit I Placeholder, #4 Redacted Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit K Placeholder, #6 Exhibit L Placeholder, #7 Redacted Exhibit M, #8 Redacted Exhibit U, #9 Redacted Exhibit Y, #10 Redacted Exhibit FF, #11 Exhibit HH, #12 Redacted Exhibit II)(Related document(s) #267 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/24/2022) Modified on 6/27/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw Redacted Public Version re #248 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw Redacted Public Version filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit A, #2 Redacted Exhibit B, #3 Redacted Exhibit C, #4 Redacted Exhibit E, #5 Redacted Exhibit F, #6 Redacted Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H Placeholder, #8 Redacted Exhibit I, #9 Redacted Exhibit J, #10 Redacted Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit M Placeholder)(Related document(s) #248 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/24/2022) Modified on 6/27/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE of Re-Filing in Response re #339 Order by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Motion for Discovery Sanctions, #2 Re-Filed Public - Martens Declaration in Support of Meta's Motion for Discovery Sanctions, #3 Re-Filed Public - O'Laughlin Declaration in Support of Meta's Motion for Discovery Sanctions and Exhibits, #4 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Motion to Exclude, #5 Re-Filed Public - Shultz Declaration in Support of Meta's Motion to Exclude and Exhibits, #6 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits, #7 Re-Filed Public - Ex. A to the Declaration of Stephen Prowse in Support of Meta's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #8 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Opposition to BrandTotal's Motion to Exclude and Exhibits, #9 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Reply in Support of Motion for Discovery Sanctions and Exhibits, #10 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude and Exhibits, #11 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Opposition to BrandTotal's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits, #12 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #13 Re-Filed Public - Meta's Supplemental Brief re hiQ)(Schultz, Allison) (Filed on 6/24/2022) Modified on 6/27/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Order. Signed 6/24/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #352 Stipulation Extending Time to File Materials Related to Fees and Costs in Connection with Order on Motion for Sanctions.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 THIRD STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Materials Related to Fees and Costs filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) and Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 6/23/2022) Modified on 6/24/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Order. Signed 6/22/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #349 Stipulation Extending Time to 6/24/2022 to File Materials Related to Fees and Costs.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/16/22, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Candy Potter, telephone number 602-322-7246; candy_potter@azd.uscourts.gov: Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2022. (Potter, Candy) (Filed on 6/21/2022) Modified on 6/22/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Stipulated Request for Order Extending Time for Parties to File Materials Related to Fees and Costs in Connection with the Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 6/17/2022) Modified on 6/21/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Statement Identifying Confidentiality Designations Subject To The Court's Ruling re #339 Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/10/2022) Modified on 6/13/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Order. Signed 6/10/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #346 Stipulation Extending Time For Parties to File Materials Related to Fees and Costs in Connection with Order on Motion for Sanctions.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Parties to File Materials Related to Fees and Costs in Connection with the Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 6/9/2022) Modified on 6/10/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/8/2022. Final pretrial and trial dates are continued. Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographi ng, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https:// www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2022 is continued to 10/7/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Jury Selection set for 8/3/2022 is continued to 10/31/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2022 is continued to 10/31/2022 -11/10/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Ari Holtzblatt. Defendant Attorney: Dustin Taylor, Kara Fussner. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2022)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Redacted version of #339 order granting in part and denying in part #246 motion for sanctions, #268 Defendants' motion for summary judgment, and #272 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. This order also resolves various administrative motions to file under seal, pending further filings as stated herein. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 27, 2022. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Defendants' #342 administrative motion to retain portions of the Court's May 27, 2022 order under seal is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. A redacted public version of that order will follow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of The Courts Order Regarding Motion for Sanctions and Motions for Summary Judgment (Ecf No. 339) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dustin Taylor, #2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference specially set for 6/8/2022 03:00 PM PDT in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings hel d by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3 1/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 PUBLIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part #246 Motion for Sanctions, #268 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and #272 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 27, 2022. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 *FILED UNDER SEAL.* ORDER. Signed 5/27/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #246 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part #268 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #272 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022) (klh, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/27/2022 (klh, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brandon L Boxler (Boxler, Brandon) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/22 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Candy L. Potter. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. Responses due by 6/3/2022. Replies due by 6/10/2022. (Hauer, Ryan) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), for Court Reporter Candy L. Potter. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2022 re #246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Facebook, Inc., #248 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw filed by Unimania, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd., #251 MOTION to Exclude in Part Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Mr. Robert Sherwood and Exclude in Full Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Dr. Gary Wilcox filed by Facebook, Inc., #268 Notice of Motion and MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Unimania, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd., #272 Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. Motions are taken under submission. Total Time in Court: 1 H. Court Reporter: Candy Potter. Attorney for Plaintiff: Sonal Mehta, Ari Holtzblatt Attorney for Defendant: Rudy Telscher, Kara Fussner, Dustin Taylor, Stephen Bosco (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) (Levy, Joseph) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Sprankling, Thomas) (Filed on 5/12/2022) Modified on 5/13/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Declaration of Dustin Taylor in Support of #326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Another Party's Material (this is a corrected version of dkt #325 ) filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #326 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/29/2022) Modified on 5/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing as to #246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions, #248 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw, #251 MOTION to Exclude in Part Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Mr. Robert Sherwood and Exclude in Full Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Dr. Gary Wilcox , #268 Notice of Motion and MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #272 Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgmenthas been specially set for 5/16/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://ww w.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.(Related documents(s) #246 , #248 , #251 , [ 268], #272 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference AND Motion Hearing as to #246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof, #251 MOTION to Exclude in Part Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Mr. Robert Sherwood and Exclude in Full Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Dr. Gary Wilcox , #272 Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof, #268 Notice of Motion and MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #248 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw set for 4/29/2022 at 9:30 AM has been continued to 5/13/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5/11/2022 by 3:00 PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., BrandTotal, Ltd and Unimania, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/22/2022) Modified on 4/25/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Supplemental Brief filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/22/2022) Modified on 4/25/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Another Party's Material (this is a corrected version of dkt #325 ) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Supplemental Brief)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Disregard- See corrected version at docket #326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Another Party's Material, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Supplemental Brief)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/22/2022) Modified on 4/25/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Supplemental Brief re #322 Order on Motion for Leave to File regarding The Ninth Circuit's Recent Decision on hiQ filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #322 ) (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/22/2022) Modified on 4/25/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Order. Signed 4/20/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #321 Stipulation on Mediation Date.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2022)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Order. Signed 4/20/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #320 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2022)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Mediation Date filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/19/2022) Modified on 4/20/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/19/2022) Modified on 4/20/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/19/2022) Modified on 4/20/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE of Consent to Unsealing re #313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Another Party's Material by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/15/2022) Modified on 4/18/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Declaration of Dustin Taylor in Support of #313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Another Party's Material, filed byBrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #313 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: The Court has no objection to the mediators proposed in the parties' #309 joint letter. The parties are ORDERED to schedule mediation in June of 2022 with any one of those mediators, and to file a joint status update when they have done so. The parties are further instructed to address their dispute as to whether to engage a technical expert to mediator, who is best positioned to determine whether such assistance would be useful and, if so, who should serve in that role. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal BrandTotal's Unredacted Version of BrandTotal Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and supporting Exhibit KK filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Supplement Unredacted Version of BrandTotal Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit KK)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 REPLY (re #272 Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin Burrell in Support Thereto, #2 Exhibit 89, #3 Exhibit 90, #4 Exhibit 91)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Another Party's Material, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of BrandTotal Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and supporting Exhibit KK filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Supplement Unredacted Version of BrandTotal Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit KK)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 REPLY (re #268 Notice of Motion and MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) Public, Redacted Version filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Exhibit JJ, #3 Exhibit KK Placeholder)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Declaration of Benjamin D. Margo in Support of #271 Administrative Motion to consider whether another party's material should be sealed, #298 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #271 , #298 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Letter from Plaintiff Meta Platforms, Inc. and Defendants BrandTotal Ltd. and Unimania, Inc. re: Selection of Mediator. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of #298 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #298 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Declaration of Dustin L. Taylor in Support of #302 Administrative Motion to consider whether another Party's Material should be sealed filed byBrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #302 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Declaration of Dustin L. Taylor in Support of #294 Meta's Administrative Motion to consider whether another party's material should be Sealed filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #294 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/7/2022) Modified on 4/8/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Declaration of Dustin Taylor in Support of #292 Meta's Administrative Motion to Consider whether another party's material should be sealed filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #292 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/6/2022) Modified on 4/7/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Order. Signed as modified on 4/5/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #296 Stipulation Extending Time to File Joint Letter Re: Mediator. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #268 Notice of Motion and MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin Burrell in Support Thereto, #2 Exhibits - 1 through 20, #3 Exhibits - 21 through 39, #4 Declaration of Fred Leach)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/1/2022) Modified on 4/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Administrative Motion to consider whether another Party's Material should be sealed filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Meta's Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 1, 2, 5, 9, 14, 16, 18, 19, 20, and 21, #3 Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 22, 23, 24, 27, 28, 32, 33, 35, 38, and 39)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/1/2022) Modified on 4/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 REPLY (re #248 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw ) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Exhibit N Redacted)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/1/2022) Modified on 4/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Administrative Motion to File Documents Pertaining to its Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Proposed Order, #3 BrandTotal's Unredacted Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude, #4 Unredacted Exhibit N)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/1/2022) Modified on 4/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #272 Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof ) filed byUnimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Exhibit A Placeholder, #3 Exhibit B Placeholder, #4 Exhibit C Redacted, #5 Exhibit D Redacted, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F Placeholder, #8 Exhibit G Redacted, #9 Exhibit H Placeholder, #10 Exhibit I Placeholder, #11 Exhibit J Redacted, #12 Exhibit K Placeholder, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M Redacted, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P Placeholder, #18 Exhibit Q Placeholder, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S Placeholder, #21 Exhibit T Placeholder, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W Placeholder, #25 Exhibit X Placeholder, #26 Exhibit Y Placeholder, #27 Exhibit Z Placeholder, #28 Exhibit AA Placeholder, #29 Exhibit BB Placeholder, #30 Exhibit CC Placeholder, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/1/2022)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed(re BrandTotal's Opposition to MSJ) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 BrandTotal's Unredacted Opposition to Meta's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Unredacted Exhibit A, #3 Unredacted Exhibit B, #4 Unredacted Exhibit D, #5 Unredacted Exhibit F, #6 Unredacted Exhibit G, #7 Unredacted Exhibit I, #8 Unredacted Exhibit S, #9 Unredacted Exhibit T, #10 Unredacted Exhibit W, #11 Unredacted Exhibit X, #12 Unredacted Exhibit Y, #13 Unredacted Exhibit Z, #14 Unredacted Exhibit AA, #15 Unredacted Exhibit BB, #16 Unredacted Exhibit CC)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/1/2022) Modified on 4/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Pertaining to BrandTotal's Opposition to Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Proposed Order, #3 BrandTotal's Unredacted Opposition to Meta's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Exhibit C, #5 Unredacted Exhibit H, #6 Unredacted Exhibit J, #7 Unredacted Exhibit K, #8 Unredacted Exhibit M, #9 Unredacted Exhibit P, #10 Unredacted Exhibit Q)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/1/2022)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Stipulated request for Order extending time for parties to file joint letter regarding Mediation WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) and Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 4/1/2022) Modified on 4/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 REPLY (re #251 MOTION to Exclude in Part Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Mr. Robert Sherwood and Exclude in Full Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Dr. Gary Wilcox ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Schultz in Support Thereto, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 18)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/1/2022)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Meta's Administrative Motion to consider whether another party's material should be Sealed filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude in Part Opinions and Testimony of Expert Witness Mr. Robert Sherwood and Exclude in Full Opinions and Testimony of Expert witness Dr. Gary Wilcox, #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/1/2022) Modified on 4/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 REPLY (re #246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Schultz in Support Thereto, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28, #5 Exhibit 29, #6 Exhibit 30, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 34, #11 Exhibit 35)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Meta's Administrative Motion to Consider whether another party's material should be sealed filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Meta's Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions, #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/30/2022) Modified on 3/31/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Order. Signed 3/28/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #289 Stipulation Extending Time For Parties to File Joint Letter re: Mediation.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Declaration of Dustin L. Taylor in Support of #281 Administrative Motion to Consider whether another party's material should be sealed filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #281 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/25/2022) Modified on 3/28/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Stipulated request for Order Extending Time to File Joint Letter Regarding Mediation with Proposed Order filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support Thereto)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/25/2022) Modified on 3/28/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof ) filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Y. Regev, #2 Declaration of D. Taylor, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B - Redacted, #5 Exhibit C - Redacted, #6 Exhibit D - Redacted, #7 Exhibit E - Redacted, #8 Exhibit F - Placeholder, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H - Redacted, #11 Exhibit I - Redacted, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L - Redacted, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N - Redacted)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Administrative Motion to File Documents pertaining to Defendants' Opposition to Meta's Motion for Discovery Sanctions filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, #4 Unredacted Declaration of Y. Regev, #5 Unredacted Exhibit A, #6 Unredacted Exhibit B, #7 Unredacted Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Exhibit D, #9 Unredacted Exhibit E, #10 Unredacted Exhibit F, #11 Unredacted Exhibit H, #12 Unredacted Exhibit I, #13 Unredacted Exhibit L, #14 Unredacted Exhibit N)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/23/2022) Modified on 3/24/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: In light of Plaintiff's decision not to pursue redactions to the remaining documents at issue (see dkt. #275 ), Defendant's #205 administrative motion to file under seal is DENIED as to all documents not resolved by the Court's #256 previous order. Plaintiff has filed the documents at issue in the public record and no further action on that motion is required. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Sealed Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Robin Burrell in Support of Meta's Opposition to defendant's Motion to exclude certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw re #281 Administrative Motion to Consider whether another party's material should be sealed (Exhibits 3 and 5) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #281 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/21/2022) Modified on 3/22/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-f ile in its entirety. Re: #283 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Declaration of Dustin Taylor in Support of #271 Administrative Motion to consider whether another party's material should be sealed filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #271 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/18/2022) Modified on 3/21/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 EXHIBITS re #281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Another Party's Material, (Exhibits 3 and 5) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #281 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/18/2022) Modified on 3/21/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #248 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw ) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin Burrell in Support Thereto, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/18/2022) Modified on 3/21/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Administrative Motion to Consider whether another party's material should be sealed filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Meta's Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/18/2022) Modified on 3/21/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of BrandTotal's Response to Meta's Motion to Exclude and supporting Exhibit C filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D. Taylor in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Supplement Unredacted Version of BrandTotal's Response to Meta's Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #251 MOTION to Exclude in Part Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Mr. Robert Sherwood and Exclude in Full Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Dr. Gary Wilcox ) filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D. Taylor, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C Placeholder, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Declaration of MICHAEL CHMELAR in Support of #267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents to BrandTotal's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #267 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/18/2022) Modified on 3/21/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Order. Signed 3/17/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #276 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stephen Bosco for BrandTotal.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16998645.) filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing)(Bosco, Stephen) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Filing in Response to Order Regarding Administrative Motion to Seal (ECF No. 256) by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Joint Letter Brief, #2 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of Meta's Position, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit D)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/15/2022) Modified on 3/16/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Order. Signed 3/14/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #273 Stipulation Extending Time for Parties to File Joint Letter RE: Mediation.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Stipulated request for Order Extending Time for Parties to file Joint letter Regarding Mediation with Proposed Order re #252 Case Management Conference - Further, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Util - Teleconference Zoom, filed by Unimania, Inc., BrandTotal, Ltd. and Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/14/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/28/2022. Replies due by 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sanchit Karve in Support Thereto, #2 Declaration of Andrew Herter in Support Thereto, #3 Declaration of Benjamin Ackerman in Support Thereto, #4 Declaration of Dr. Stephen Prowse in Support Thereto, #5 Exhibit A re Prowse Declaration, #6 Declaration of Allison Schultz in Support Thereto, #7 Exhibit 1 to 44 re Schultz Declaration, #8 Exhibit 45 to 88 re Schultz Declaration, #9 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/12/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Administrative Motion to consider whether another party's material should be sealed filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 1, 7, 13 to 15, 17 to 20, 22, 23, 25, 26, 31, 36 to 39, 46 to 50, 53 to 60, #3 Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 61 to 77, 79 to 81, 84 to 88, and A, #4 Unredacted Version of Attachment 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Attachment 2)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/12/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential information in Meta's Motion for partial summary Judgment and Exhibits thereto filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support Thereto, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 40, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 45, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 80, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 82, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/12/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Declaration of Oscar Padilla In Support of BrandTotal's Motion for partial summary Judgment- EXHIBITS re #268 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to O. Padilla Declaration In Support of BrandTotal Motion for PSJ, #2 2 to O. Padilla Declaration In Support of BrandTotal Motion for PSJ, #3 3 to O. Padilla Declaration In Support of BrandTotal Motion for PSJ, #4 4 to O. Padilla Declaration In Support of BrandTotal Motion for PSJ)(Related document(s) #268 ) (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 3/12/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Notice of Motion and MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/1/2022. Replies due by 4/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Fussner in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of O. Padilla in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D - Placeholder, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F - Redacted, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I - Placeholder, #12 Exhibit J - Redacted, #13 Exhibit K - Placeholder, #14 Exhibit L - Placeholder, #15 Exhibit M - Placeholder, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U - Placeholder, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y - Redacted, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF - Redacted, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH - Placeholder, #37 Exhibit II - Redacted)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 3/12/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents to BrandTotal's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kara Fussner in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 BrandTotal's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #4 Ex. D to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #5 Ex. F to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #6 Ex. I to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #7 Ex. J to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #8 Ex. K to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #9 Ex. L to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #10 Ex. M to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #11 Ex. U to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #12 Ex. Y to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #13 Ex. FF to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #14 Ex. HH to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED, #15 Ex. II to BrandTotal's PMSJ UNREDACTED)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 3/12/2022)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER regarding electronic filing service disruption. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 11, 2022. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Declaration of Dustin L. Taylor in Support of #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Revised Declaration filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #249 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/9/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Declaration of Dustin L. Taylor in Support of #250 Meta Platform Inc's Administrative Motion to Consider whether another party's material should be Sealed filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #250 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/9/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Declaration of Dustin L. Taylor in Support of #245 Administrative Motion to Seal Motion for Discovery Sanctions Revised Declaration filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #245 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/9/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Order. Signed 3/9/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #247 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Anderson.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions; #251 MOTION to Exclude in Part Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Mr. Robert Sherwood and Exclude in Full Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Dr. Gary Wilcox ; #248 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw set for 4/29/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a tex t-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part #257 Motion for Extension of Time. Opposition to sanctions motion due 3/23/2022. Reply due 3/30/2022. Hearing continued to 4/29/2022 at 9:30 AM. Defendants may use Oren Dor's forthcoming deposition testimony taken by Plaintiff for the limited purpose of opposing sanctions based on Dor's purported perjury. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #257 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Opposition to Motion to Enlarge Time, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' #257 motion to extend time no later than 5:00 PM today (March 8, 2022). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D. Taylor, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Public versions and further declaration due March 15, 2022. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #249 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/4/2022) Modified on 3/7/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER regarding administrative motions to file under seal. Responsive declarations due March 9, 2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 4, 2022. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Declaration of Dustin Taylor in Support of #245 Administrative Motion to Seal Motion for Discovery Sanctions filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #245 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 3/3/2022) Modified on 3/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/25/2022. Parties to file a joint letter by 3/11/2022 with the name of the mediator and mediation date. Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or video conference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Sonal Mehta. Defendant Attorney: Dustin Taylor. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION to Exclude in Part Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Mr. Robert Sherwood and Exclude in Full Opinions and Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness Dr. Gary Wilcox filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/18/2022. Replies due by 4/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Schultz in Support Thereto, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/25/2022) Modified on 10/3/2022 (klh, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Meta Platform Inc's Administrative Motion to Consider whether another party's material should be Sealed filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #3 Unredacted Version of Schultz Declaration, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/25/2022) Modified on 3/3/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D. Taylor in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Supplement Unredacted Version of BrandTotal's Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit M)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Prowse and Dr. Thaw filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/18/2022. Replies due by 4/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D. Taylor, #2 Exhibit A Placeholder, #3 Exhibit B Placeholder, #4 Exhibit C Placeholder, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E Placeholder, #7 Exhibit F Placeholder, #8 Exhibit G Placeholder, #9 Exhibit H Placeholder, #10 Exhibit I Placeholder, #11 Exhibit J Placeholder, #12 Exhibit K Placeholder, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 2/25/2022) Modified on 2/28/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/3/2022 (klh, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16938571.) filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, David) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Notice of Motion and Motion for Discovery sanctions, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/10/2022. Replies due by 3/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Martens in Support Thereto, #2 Declaration of Andy O'Laughlin in Support Thereto, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/24/2022) Modified on 2/25/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Administrative Motion to Seal Motion for Discovery Sanctions filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unredacted Version of Motion for Sanctions, #3 Unredacted Version of Marten's Declaration, #4 Unredacted Version of O'Laughlin Declaration, #5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2, #7 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, #9 Unredacted Version of Ex. 5, #10 Unredacted Version of Ex. 6, #11 Unredacted Version of Ex. 7, #12 Unredacted Version of Ex. 13, #13 Unredacted Version of Ex. 14, #14 Unredacted Version of Ex. 16, #15 Unredacted Version of Ex. 17, #16 Unredacted Version of Ex. 18, #17 Unredacted Version of Ex. 19, #18 Unredacted Version of Ex. 20, #19 Unredacted Version of Ex. 21, #20 Unredacted Version of Ex. 22, #21 Unredacted Version of Ex. 23, #22 Unredacted Version of Ex. 24, #23 Unredacted Version of Ex. 25)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/24/2022) Modified on 2/25/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Order. Signed 2/24/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #243 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limits.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Stipulated request for Order to Exceed Applicable Page Limits with Proposed Order filed by Facebook, Inc. BrandTotal, Ltd and Unimania, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/24/2022) Modified on 2/24/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses/Oppositions to MSJ due by 4/1/2022. Replies to MSJ due by 4/8/2022. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)See Order #241
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc., BrandTotal, Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/18/2022) Modified on 2/22/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part #233 Motion for Extension of Time. The briefing schedule for summary judgment motions is altered as stated herein. The April 29, 2022 hearing date is unchanged. Witness redepositions to be completed by February 22, 2022. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ann Marie Mortimer (Notice of Withdrawal of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP as Counsel for Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (f/k/a/ Facebook, Inc.)) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Motions Briefing ) filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 2/18/2022) Modified on 2/22/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 CLERK'S NOTICE: If possible, the Court would appreciate if Defendants could file their response to Plaintiff's #233 Motion to Extend Time by 3:30 PM Pacific Time today, to allow the Court to decide the motion before the close of business. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Notice for Supplemental Materials to Meta's Motion pursuant to L.R. 6-3 to enlarge time for Re-Depositions and for Motions Briefing filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 2/18/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Order. Signed 2/17/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #235 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Brandon Boxler.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16913520.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Boxler, Brandon) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Order. Signed 2/15/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #231 Administrative Motion For Appointment of Mr. Shai Sharvit, Esq.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Motions Briefing filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andy O'Laughlin in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. (Notice of Additional Opinion From Israeli Magistrate Court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for an Order Requesting (1) appointment of Mr. Shai Sharvit, Esq., as the attorney or judicial officer to preside over the testimony given at the depositions of Messrs. Leshman and Dor at Mr. Sharvits office between March 7, 2022 and March 10, 2022, (2) issuance of summons by the Israeli Magistrate Court requiring Messrs. Leshmans and Dors attendance at the depositions to be held at Mr. Sharvits office; and (3) that each deposition be taken in accordance with the U.S. Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the remote deposition protocol that the Parties have agreed to for fact depositions in this case, filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 2/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support Thereto, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 2/11/2022) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 2/14/2022 (ddk, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Order. Signed 1/31/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #229 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 2/25/2022. Replies due by 4/1/2022. Responses/Oppositions due by 3/18/2022.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule (Joint) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Order. Signed 1/27/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #227 Stipulation Regarding Additional Depositions.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Additional Depositions filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/26/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Defendants shall continue to produce non-privileged documents that were inadvertently caught by their privilege screen on a rolling basis, and shall produce all such documents and their final privilege log no later than January 28, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) re #221 Scheduling Conference, (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STATUS REPORT by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/17/2022)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STATUS REPORT by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding #206 Discovery Letter Brief. Plaintiff shall produce documents as stated herein no later than January 14, 2022. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2022. Status report due 1/14/2022. Digital Reporter: Zoom Webinar Time: 3:02-3:30. Plaintiff Attorney: Sonal Mehta. Defendant Attorney: Dustin Taylor, Kara Fussner. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Pursuant to Order #219 , the scheduling conference set for 1/10/2022 at 3:00 PM PST will held by Zoom video. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by te lephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Related documents(s) #219 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #217 motion for relief from stipulation. Scheduling conference set for 1/10/2022 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero via Zoom webinar. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Proposed Order re #217 MOTION to Relieve BrandTotal From the Joint Stipulation at ECF No. 216 by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 1/8/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION to Relieve BrandTotal From the Joint Stipulation at ECF No. 216 filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 1/21/2022. Replies due by 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor, #2 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Order. Signed 12/29/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #215 Stipulation Addressing Discovery Disputes.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Addressing Discovery Disputes filed by Facebook, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd, and Unimania, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/23/2021) Modified on 12/23/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Order. signed 12/17/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #213 Stipulation to Modify Expert Discovery Schedule. Designation of Experts due by 1/12/2022. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 2/3/2022.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Joint Stipulation And Proposed Order To Modify Expert Discovery Schedule re #167 Order on Stipulation, filed by Facebook, Inc. and Unimania, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/16/2021) Modified on 12/16/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING re #209 STIPULATION to Amend the Caption filed by Facebook, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/13/2021. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 PLEASE DISREGARD.Order. Signed 12/13/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #209 Stipulation to Amend Caption.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) Modified on 12/14/2021 (klh, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent no parent corporation for Facebook, Inc.. (Amended) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend the Caption filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 EXHIBITS re #205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief on Discovery Dispute No. 4 (Exhibit A with Proposed Redactions) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #205 ) (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of #205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief on Discovery Dispute No. 4 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #205 ) (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Copies of AO 30 Form and Docket No. #203 mailed to Ari Holtzblatt. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Joint Discovery Letter Brief No. Four (4) filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for M. Chlemar Declaration ISO Facebook's Position, #2 Exhibits A-D Placeholders, #3 Exhibit E)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief on Discovery Dispute No. 4 filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Public Redacted Joint Letter Brief on Discovery Dispute No. 4, #3 Public Placeholder M. Chmelar Decl. ISO Facebook's Position in Joint Letter Brief, #4 Public Placeholders Exhibits A-D, #5 Unredacted Joint Letter Brief on Discovery Dispute No. 4, #6 Unredacted M. Chmelar Decl. ISO Facebook's Position in Joint Letter Brief, #7 Unredacted Exhibits A-D)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Order. Signed 11/22/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #200 Stipulation re: Discovery Disputes.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Letter Rogatory issued. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/22/2021. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Order. Signed 11/22/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #201 Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Letters of Request of the Examination of Witnesses in Israel. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Ex Parte Application (Unopposed) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to the Hague Convention, #2 Proposed Order)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes filed by Facebook, Inc.., BrandTotal, Ltd and Unimania, Inc. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 11/19/2021) Modified on 11/22/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (HEARING NOT REPORTED OR RECORDED - NO TRANSCRIPT AVAILABLE) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/12/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/15/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (rjd, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/12/2021. Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digita l Reporter : Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Sonal Mehta, Ari Holtzblatt Attorney for Defendant: Kara Fussner, Dustin Taylor (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2021)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/5/2021) Modified on 11/8/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER. Signed 10/18/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #194 Facebook's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Order. Signed 10/18/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #192 BrandTotal's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit Y to BrandTotal's Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit M to Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaim, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Y to BrandTotal's Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M to Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaim)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Declaration of Allison Schultz Regarding Public Filing of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order (ECF No. 188), Documents in Support of its Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF 126) and Reply to Same (ECF 136) filed by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Fussner, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Public Version of Ex. X to BrandTotal's Motion for PI, #4 Redacted Public Version of Ex. Z to BrandTotal's Motion for PI, #5 Redacted Public Version of Ex. EE to BrandTotal's Motion for PI, #6 Redacted Public Version of Ex. OO to BrandTotal's Reply to Motion for PI, #7 Unredacted Ex. X to BrandTotal's Motion for PI, #8 Unredacted Ex. Z to BrandTotal's Motion for PI, #9 Unredacted Ex. EE to BrandTotal's Motion for PI, #10 Unredacted Ex. OO to BrandTotal's Reply to Motion for PI)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE by BrandTotal Ltd.(an Israeli corporation), Unimania, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) re #188 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 119-03, #2 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 119-07, #3 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-25, #4 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-26, #5 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-36, #6 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-37, #7 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-38, #8 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 126-10, #9 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 139-03, #10 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 139-05, #11 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 162-03, #12 Public Redacted Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 119-08, #13 Public Redacted Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-09, #14 Public Redacted Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-10, #15 Public Redacted Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-11, #16 Public Redacted Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-12, #17 Public Redacted Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 137-03, #18 Public Redacted Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 162-08, #19 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-29, #20 Public Version of Doc Filed at Dkt 125-33)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order. Signed 10/13/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #189 Stipulation Re: Non-Waiver of Privilege.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Non-Waiver of Privilege filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #119 #125 #133 #137 #162 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal; and denying #131 #139 #141 #171 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #183 Counterclaim byFacebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 8-26-2021, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #177 Transcript Order, #176 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2021. (Related documents(s) #177 , #176 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER. Signed 9/8/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #182 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Andres O'Laughlin (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Order. Signed 9/8/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Cindy Pan.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Third Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Facebook, Inc.. Filed byUnimania, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd.. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 9/7/2021) Modified on 9/8/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16362834.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (O'Laughlin, Andres) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16362816.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Pan, Cindy) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding #179 Discovery Letter Brief. BrandTotal is ORDERED to make its source code available for inspection. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Facebook, Inc. and BrandTotal Ltd. and Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/1/2021) Modified on 9/2/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #161 Motion for Leave to Amend; granting #169 Motion to Dismiss. BrandTotal shall file it second amended counterclaims as a separate docket entry no later than September 3, 2021. Facebook shall answer the surviving counterclaims no later than September 14, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2021 re #169 MOTION to Dismiss the Defendants Second Amended Counterclaims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Facebook, Inc., Further Case Management Conference not held on 8/27/2021. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Gene ral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Total Time in Court: 38 M. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attorney for Plaintif f: Sonal Mehta, Ari Holtzblatt Attorney for Defendant: Rudy Telscher, Dustin Taylor, Kara Fussner(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/27/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Supplemental Event by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc. re #161 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaims, #170 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Press Release, #2 Attachment 2 - FTC Letter)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPLY in Support (re #169 MOTION to Dismiss the Defendants Second Amended Counterclaims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Document in Support of BrandTotal's Consolidated Reply filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor in Support of Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (unredacted sealed version), #4 Exhibit A (public placeholder version))(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REPLY in Support (re #161 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaims, #169 MOTION to Dismiss the Defendants Second Amended Counterclaims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Taylor In Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit A (placeholder))(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #169 MOTION to Dismiss the Defendants Second Amended Counterclaims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Responses due by 7/28/2021. Replies due by 8/4/2021. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #161 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaims); and MOTION to Dismiss the Defendants Second Amended Counterclaims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/15/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING TIME AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 2:00 PM will be held on the SAME DAY at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Or der 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order. Signed 7/12/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #166 Stipulation to Modify Pretrial Schedule. Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/18/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 11/19/2021. Designation of Experts due by 12/21/2021. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 1/28/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be determined. Jury Selection set for 8/3/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2022 through 8/15/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Motion and Daubert Hearing set for 4/29/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Pretrial Schedule filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff R.R. Nelson in Support)(Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: The parties' #165 Stipulation is GRANTED, as modified with respect to the time of the hearing. Facebook shall file its consolidated opposition and motion to dismiss (not exceeding 25 pages) no later than July 14, 2021. BrandTotal shall file its consolidated opposition and reply (not exceeding 25 pages) no later than July 28, 2021. Facebook shall file its reply (not exceeding 10 pages) no later than August 4, 2021. The motions will be heard at 9:30 AM on August 27, 2021 via Zoom webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaims filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta, #2 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/28/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of #162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #162 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Telscher in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit 1 Redacted Second Amended Counterclaims, #4 Exhibit 1 Sealed Second Amended Counterclaims, #5 Exhibit D Sealed, #6 Exhibit E Sealed, #7 Exhibit L Redacted, #8 Exhibit L Sealed, #9 Exhibit M Sealed)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaims filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit 1 BrandTotal Second Amended Counterclaims, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D Placeholder, #7 Exhibit E Placeholder, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L Redacted, #15 Exhibit M Placeholder)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order. Signed 6/14/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #159 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Amended Counterclaims.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time to Answer First Amended Counterclaims and Respond to Second Amended Counterclaims filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER regarding #132 motion to dismiss first amended counterclaims. Defendants may file a second amended counterclaim no later than June 25, 2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 3, 2021. (Public version of #152 order previously filed provisionally under seal.) (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying #155 request to redact previous order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 9, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Transcript of Zoom Webinar Proceedings held on May 28, 2021, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #151 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (Related documents(s) #151 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE to #153 Order to Show Cause filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Highlighted Proposed Redactions - Sealed, #3 Supplement Redacted - Public)(Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/8/2021) Modified on 6/9/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ANSWER to #148 Amended Complaint by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why #152 Order should not be filed in the public record. Responses due 6/8/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 3, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNERCLAIMS. PROVISIONALLY FILED UNDER SEAL Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/3/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/28/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying as moot #126 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2021 re #132 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims filed by Facebook, Inc., #126 (Renewed) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Unimania, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd. Motions Submitted. Case Mgmt Conference Statement due 8/20/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Total Time in Court: 1 H 12 M. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Attorney for Plaintiff: Sonal Mehta, Ari Holtzblatt, Ann Marie Mortimer Attorney for Defendant: Rudy Telscher, Dustin Taylor, Kara Fussner (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2021)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Order. Signed 5/24/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #145 Stipulation for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint (FRCP 15(A)(2)) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Conference Statement Due 5/21/2021. Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing as to #126 (Renewed) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #132 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims, currently set for 5/14/2021 is re-set for 5/28/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. These proceedings will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Pe rsons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry .) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Declaration of Dustin L. Taylor in Support of #141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY in Support of (re #132 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Facebook, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Facebook's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of #137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of BrandTotal's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Exhibit A filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #137 , #139 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of BrandTotal's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Exhibit A filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Supplement Unredacted Version of BrandTotal's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Supplement Public Redacted Version of BrandTotal's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit A - Sealed)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims ) Redacted Version filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher, #2 Exhibit A Placeholder)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher in Support of Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of BrandTotal's Reply to PI Motion, #4 Unredacted Decl. of A. Leibovich in Support of Reply, #5 Exhibit OO (Unredacted), #6 Redacted Version of BrandTotal's Reply to PI Motion, #7 Redacted Decl. of A. Leibovich in Support of Reply)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REPLY in Support (re #126 (Renewed) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (Redacted) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher, #2 Declaration of A. Leibovich (Redacted), #3 Exhibit MM, #4 Exhibit NN, #5 Exhibit OO (Placeholder))(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of #134 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #134 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #126 (Renewed) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Facebooks Opposition to Brandtotals Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of Facebooks Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Facebook's Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion, #4 Unredacted Version of Facebook's Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit CC, #28 Exhibit DD, #29 Exhibit EE)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/16/2021. Replies due by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information In Facebooks Motion To Dismiss Brandtotals First Amended Counterclaims filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Chmelar ISO Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Order. Signed 3/18/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #129 Stipulation To Extend Deadline to Amend Pleadings. Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2021.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO AMEND PLEADINGS filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff R. R. Nelson In Support of Stipulation to Extend Deadline To Amend Pleadings)(Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of #125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of its Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #125 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING re #122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Exceed Applicable Page Limitations filed by Unimania, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/12/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #124 Order on Stipulation (klhS, COURT STAFF) ( Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 (Renewed) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/9/2021. Replies due by 4/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion (redacted public version), #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of A. Leibovich (redacted public version), #4 Declaration of O. Dor (redacted public version), #5 Declaration of R. Telscher, #6 Report of Robert Sherwood with Appendices A-H (redacted public version), #7 Declaration of W. Hartzog, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibits A-K, M-N, P, S-T, W-Z, AA, DD-FF, and HH (placeholders), #9 Exhibit L, #10 Exhibit O, #11 Exhibit Q, #12 Exhibit R, #13 Exhibit U, #14 Exhibit V, #15 Exhibit BB, #16 Exhibit CC, #17 Exhibit GG, #18 Exhibit II (redacted public version), #19 Exhibit JJ, #20 Exhibit KK, #21 Exhibit LL)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of its Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher in Support of Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Memorandum in Support for Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Redacted Version of Declaration of A. Leibovich, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration of O. Dor, #6 Redacted Version of Report of Robert Sherwood with Appendices A-H, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibits A-K, M-N, P, S-T, W-Z, AA, DD-FF, and HH (placeholders), #8 Redacted Exhibit II, #9 Unredacted Version of Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #10 Unredacted Version of Declaration of A. Leibovich, #11 Unredacted Version of Declaration of O. Dor, #12 Unredacted Version of Report of Robert Sherwood with Appendices A-H, #13 Unredacted Ex. A, #14 Unredacted Ex. B, #15 Unredacted Ex. C, #16 Unredacted Ex. D, #17 Unredacted Ex. E, #18 Unredacted Ex. F, #19 Unredacted Ex. G, #20 Unredacted Ex. H, #21 Unredacted Ex. I, #22 Unredacted Ex. J, #23 Unredacted Ex. K, #24 Unredacted Ex. M, #25 Unredacted Ex. N, #26 Unredacted Ex. P, #27 Unredacted Ex. S, #28 Unredacted Ex. T, #29 Unredacted Ex. W, #30 Unredacted Ex. X, #31 Unredacted Ex. Y, #32 Unredacted Ex. Z, #33 Unredacted Ex. AA, #34 Unredacted Ex. DD, #35 Unredacted Ex. EE, #36 Unredacted Ex. FF, #37 Unredacted Ex. HH, #38 Unredacted Ex. II)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PLEASE DISREGARD. WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED. Order. Signed 3/12/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #122 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limits.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021) Modified on 3/15/2021 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Proposed Order re #122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Exceed Applicable Page Limitations (Correction re: #122 -1 Proposed Order by BrandTotal Ltd.. (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 3/11/2021) Modified on 3/11/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Exceed Applicable Page Limitations filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 3/11/2021) Modified on 3/11/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Declaration of Michael Chmelar in Support of #119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #119 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Facebook, Inc.. Filed byBrandTotal Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D Placeholder, #5 Exhibit E Placeholder, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G Placeholder, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L - Redacted)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BrandTotal Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit Sealed Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims, #5 Exhibit Sealed Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Sealed Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Sealed Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Sealed Ex. L, #9 Exhibit Redacted Ex. L)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/19/21, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #114 Transcript Order, #113 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2021. (Related documents(s) #114 , #113 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order. Signed 3/4/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #116 Stipulation Changing Time of Certain Deadlines Set Forth in Order #112 . BrandTotal's Motion For Preliminary Injunction due by 3/12/2021. Facebook's Responses/Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 4/9/2021.BrandTotal's Replies to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 4/16/2021.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Facebook's Responses /Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 4/9/2021. BrandTotal's Replies Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 4/16/2021. See #117 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME OF CERTAIN DEADLINES SET FORTH IN ORDER ECF NO. 112 filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kara Fussner, #2 Proposed Order)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Letter Brief Regarding a Discovery Dispute (Joint) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Leibovich Transcript Redacted-Public)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. Signed as modified on 2/24/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Amended Counterclaim Complaint due by 3/5/2021.BrandTotal's Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 3/5/2021. Facebook's Motion to Dismiss Amended Counter Claim Complaint due by 3/26/2021. Facebook's Responses/Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 3/26/2021.BrandTotal's Replies to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 4/2/2021. BrandTotal's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim Complaint due 4/16/2021 Facebook's Replies to Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim Complaint due 4/30/2021. Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2021. Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero resolving #101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and #102 Discovery Letter Brief. Facebook shall file public documents no later than March 1, 2021. BrandTotal shall search for and produce documents no later than March 8, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Letter from Sonal N. Mehta Regarding Agreed-Upon Proposed Briefing Schedule (Joint). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion ECF Nos. 103, 104 (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #77 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. The parties shall file a joint letter on February 22, 2021 proposing a schedule. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order, signed 2/19/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #105 Stipulated Protective Order.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2021 re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Facebook, Inc. Parties to meet and confer by Zoom video to work on a briefing schedule for the Preliminary Injunction Motion and Motion to Dismiss and file a joint letter by 2/22/2021. Total Time in Court: 1 H 2 M. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Attorney for Plaintiff: Sonal Mehta, Ari Holtzblatt, Ann Marie Mortimer Attorney for Defendant: Rudy Telscher (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: See Minute Order #106 . Amended Pleadings due by 3/22/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/3/2021. Designation of Experts due by 9/17/2021. Rebuttal Reports due by 10/15/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 11/12/2021. Motion and Daubert Hearing set for 1/21/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Jury Selection set for 6/1/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2022 through 6/13/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/4/2021. Replies due by 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion (redacted public version), #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of A. Leibovich (redacted public version), #4 Declaration of O. Dor (redacted public version), #5 Report of Robert Sherwood with Appendices A-G (redacted public version), #6 Declaration of R. Telscher, #7 Exhibits A-Z and AA-DD)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher in Support of Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admin. Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Memorandum in Support for Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Redacted Version of Declaration of A. Leibovich, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration of O. Dor, #6 Redacted Version of Report of Robert Sherwood with Appendices A-G, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibits A-T and W-DD (placeholders), #8 Unredacted Version of Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Unredacted Version of Declaration of A. Leibovich, #10 Unredacted Version of Declaration of O. Dor, #11 Unredacted Version of Report of Robert Sherwood with Appendices A-G, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit L, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M, #25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit N, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O, #27 Unredacted Version of Exhibit P, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q, #29 Unredacted Version of Exhibit R, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit S, #31 Unredacted Version of Exhibit T, #32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit W, #33 Unredacted Version of Exhibit X, #34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Y, #35 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Z, #36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit AA, #37 Unredacted Version of Exhibit DD)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan B. Hauer in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REPLY in Support (re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims) (Re-Filed Pursuant to Docket Entry 98) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #96 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY in Support (re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Schultz in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Facebook Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims, #4 Unredacted Version of Facebook Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Letter from Joint Discovery Letter Brief Refiling of ECF No. 92. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Second order to file documents in the public record, as stated in #93 previous order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 26, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero resolving #92 Discovery Letter Brief and denying #91 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F Placeholder, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Joint Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Joint Letter Brief Filed Under Seal, #5 Unredacted Exhibit F Filed Under Seal)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims ) filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order, signed 12/30/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Dustin Taylor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #86 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due 2/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 9:30 AM. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15380365.) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Taylor, Dustin) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES re #11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff R. R. Nelson In Support of Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines)(Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #81 administrative motion for referral for settlement conference. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #81 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Refer Case to Settlement Conference Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-11 and Local ADR Rule 3-2 ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal Mehta, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel for Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs BrandTotal Ltd. and Unimania, Inc. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel for Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Refer Case to Settlement Conference Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-11 and Local ADR Rule 3-2 filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher, #2 Proposed Order)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 12/21/2020) Modified on 12/22/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER, signed 12/3/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #79 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher, #2 Proposed Order)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines per Order #80 as to #77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims. Responses due by 1/6/2021. Replies due by 2/3/2021. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court procee dings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (klhS, CO URT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Request for Judicial Notice re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #77 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 12/7/2020. Replies due by 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/20/20, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #73 Transcript Order, #75 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2021. (Related documents(s) #73 , #75 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2020 re #65 MOTION for Discovery filed by Unimania, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd. ; granting #65 Motion for Discovery.Total Time in Court: 14 M. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Sonal Mehta, Ari Holtzblatt. Defendant Attorney: Rudolph Telscher, Kara Fussner. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #65 MOTION for Discovery ) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal Mehta, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REDACTION (Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order) re #27 by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/16/2020) Modified on 11/17/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Brief re #64 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Unsealed Reply in Support of BrandTotal's Motion for TRO (ECF No. 27) filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Declaration of Oren Dorr in Support of #64 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Unsealed Declaration in Support of BrandTotal's Motion for TRO (ECF No. 27) filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Brief re #64 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Unsealed Memorandum in Support of BrandTotal's Motion for TRO (ECF No. 27) filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order, signed as modified on 11/12/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #66 Stipulation to Shorten Time for Briefing on BrandTotal's Motion for Early Discovery.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #65 MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Early, Expedited Discovery and to Set a Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 11/18/2020. No reply brief. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Responses due by 11/18/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 09:30 AM in Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. See Order #67 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Shorten Time for Briefing on BrandTotal's Motion for Early Expedited Discovery filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Fussner, #2 Proposed Order)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Early, Expedited Discovery and to Set a Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. Responses due by 11/25/2020. Replies due by 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Fussner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #26 #38 #49 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying #27 motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 2, 2020. (Previously filed under seal as docket entry #58 .) (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE TO #59 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc. with Renewed Consolidated Request to Seal Narrowed Portions of Certain Documents in TRO briefing. (Attachments: #1 Updated Redacted Declaration of Alon Leibovich with Exhibits A-E, #2 Updated Redacted Reply Declaration of Alon Leibovich)(Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order, signed 11/4/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #60 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Counterclaims.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Englarge Time to Respond to Counterclaims filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta, #2 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why documents should not be filed in the public record. Response due by November 9, 2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 2, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER, signed 11/2/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #27 Motion for TRO. FILED UNDER SEAL. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 26, 2020, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #55 Transcript Order, #56 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2021. (Related documents(s) #55 , #56 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings Zoom held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2020 re #27 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Unimania, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd.. Motion submitted. Total Time in Court: 54 M. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Sonal Mehta, Ari Holtzblatt, Stacy Chen - in house counsel. Defendant Attorney: Rudolph Telscher, Karkl Kronenberger, Ryan Hauer, David Stauss. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE: Members of the public seeking to observe the argument currently taking place on October 26, 2020 should use the following teleconference line: dial in number 888-684-8852, access code 8256171. The Court apologizes for technical difficulties with the Zoom webinar.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Declaration of Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr. in Support of #38 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Related document(s) #38 ) (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Prehearing order regarding argument on #27 motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 23, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #27 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2020 02:00 PM in Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY (re #27 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) Redacted-Public Reply filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of O. Dor, #2 Supplemental Declaration of A. Leibovich (Redacted-Public), #3 Declaration of R. Telscher, #4 Ex. P - Public Placeholder, #5 Ex. Q, #6 Ex. R, #7 Ex. S, #8 Ex. T, #9 Ex. U, #10 Ex. V, #11 Ex. W, #12 Ex. X)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for TRO and certain supporting documents filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher in Support of Motion to Seal Reply, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted - Reply to TRO, #4 Redacted - Supp. Leibovich Decl., #5 Redacted - Ex. P, #6 UNREDACTED - Reply to TRO, #7 UNREDACTED - Supp. Leibovich Decl., #8 UNREDACTED - Ex. P)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER, signed 10/22/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Burrell. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER, signed 10/22/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Schultz. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order, signed 10/22/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Holtzenblatt.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Declaration of Rob Leathern in Support of #39 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #39 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Declaration of Jason J. Kim in Support of #39 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Declaration of Michael Duffey in Support of #39 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Declaration of Sanchit Karve in Support of #39 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Declaration of Mike Clark in Support of #39 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of #39 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Levy in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order ISO Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15094044.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Burrell, Robin) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15093982.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Schultz, Allison) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15093917.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order, signed 10/21/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Stauss.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15086856.) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Stauss, David) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Levy (Levy, Joseph) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Sprankling (Sprankling, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on #28 administrative motion; setting schedule for #27 motion for temporary restraining order. Opposition due October 21, 2020. Reply due October 22, 2020. Motion Hearing set for October 26, 2020 at 2:00 PM.(jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2020)
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule re #27 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) respectfully requesting Facebook's TRO Opposition be due Monday, October 19th, or as otherwise directed by the Court filed byBrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/17/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule re #27 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason J. Kim, #2 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Motion for TRO (redacted public version), #2 Declaration of Oren Dor in Support of TRO (redacted public version), #3 Declaration of Alon Leibovich in Support of TRO with Ex. A-E (redacted public version), #4 Declaration of R. Telscher in Support of TRO, #5 Proposed Order Granting TRO and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Telscher In Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Memorandum to Motion for TRO, #4 Redacted Declaration of Oren Dor, #5 Redacted Declaration of Alon Leibovich with Exhibits A-E, #6 UNREDACTED Memorandum, #7 UNREDACTED Declaration of Oren Dor, #8 UNREDACTED Declaration of Alon Leibovich with Exhibits A-E)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc... (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Facebook, Inc. byUnimania, Inc., BrandTotal Ltd.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Unimania, Inc. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by BrandTotal Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate BrandTotal, Inc. for BrandTotal Ltd.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Unimania, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BrandTotal Ltd. for Unimania, Inc.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by BrandTotal Ltd. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, signed 10/16/2020, by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Ryan Hauer. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, signed 10/16/2020, by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kara Fussner. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, signed 10/16/2020, by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Telscher. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc... (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15069466.) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Hauer, Ryan) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15069423.) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Fussner, Kara) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15068190.) filed by BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc.. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Stephen Kronenberger (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Facebook, Inc. Service waived by Unimania, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 10/15/2020) Modified on 10/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Facebook, Inc.. Service waived by BrandTotal Ltd. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 10/15/2020) Modified on 10/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/29/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BrandTotal Ltd., Unimania, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15064984.). Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 10/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meta Platforms, Inc. v. BrandTotal Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrandTotal Ltd.
Represented By: Rudolph A. Telscher
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Ryan B Hauer
Represented By: Kara Renee Fussner
Represented By: David Eric Anderson
Represented By: Dustin L. Taylor
Represented By: Stephen P. Bosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimania, Inc.
Represented By: Rudolph A. Telscher
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Ryan B Hauer
Represented By: Kara Renee Fussner
Represented By: Dustin L. Taylor
Represented By: Stephen P. Bosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: Thomas G. Sprankling
Represented By: Allison Schultz
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Joseph Michael Levy
Represented By: Andres R O'Laughlin
Represented By: Brandon L Boxler
Represented By: Cindy Y. Pan
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim
Represented By: Jeff R. R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: Allison Schultz
Represented By: Andres R O'Laughlin
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Brandon L Boxler
Represented By: Cindy Y. Pan
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim
Represented By: Jeff R. R. Nelson
Represented By: Joseph Michael Levy
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Thomas G. Sprankling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?