Young et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Bushra Ahmad Sada Abusal, Md Nahidur Rahman, Marianne Christel Lorenz, Altemar Amparo Duran, Mariandr Rubio Mackepeace, Tirth Raj Bhatt, Saadia Gabr, Marlo Maila Garcia Aronce, Farhana Kashfi Zahir, Muminkhon Saidov, Amina Dalil, Alex Vadakkeparampil Augustine, Mayyadah Bader Mahmoud Albadri, Eftikar Kamel Samara, Paria Naghipour Ghezeljeh, Sea Novaku, Pierre-Richard Noizil, Mohammad Othman, Adonis Christopher Edwards, Carline M. Bisseret, Behnam Pournader, Mohamed Hassan Hafez Ahmed, Malouk Mohamed, H. M.H.H. A., Anthony Ishwar Moonesar, Noel A. Ruiz, Sadorathon Orifzoda, Sven Arne Lorenz, Mobeen Salah Ud Din, Lmia Ayman Jalakh, Alban Traga, Anu Sara Raju, Parivash Khodavirdizadeh Ghahramani, Y. M.H.H. A., N. M.H.H. A., Rabea Therese Kruegel, Hafiza Sulta, Rubaiyat Islam, Hayder Waleed Mohammed Al-Saadi, Mohammadhassan Pournader, N. M.H.H. A.(2), M. J. A., El Shaimaa Raouf Aly Abdelfattah, Tracia Chevannese Young, Sara Moonesar, Josefina Garcia Aronce, Naila Abad, Kamala Paneru, Larixandra Lara Hernandez and Aon Jafar Abdallah Almasri
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf, Michael R. Pompeo and Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 3:2020cv07183
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) REGARDING FILING #33 . Document was filed erroneously with confidential information and is removed from the docket. See #34 Amended Order. By Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Denying #18 Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/2020. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 *** DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT REMOVED, SEE DOCUMENT 35 . *** ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Denying #18 Defendants' Motion to Transfer. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020) Modified on 12/11/2020 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 33 replaced on 12/11/2020) (fff, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2020 Filing 32 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #25 Reply to Opposition/Response, re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , re #31 Motion Hearing, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case filed by H. M.H.H. A., M. J. A., N. M.H.H. A., Y. M.H.H. A., N. M.H.H. A.(2), Naila Abad, El Shaimaa Raouf Aly Abdelfattah, Bushra Ahmad Sada Abusal, Mohamed Hassan Hafez Ahmed, Hayder Waleed Mohammed Al-Saadi, Mayyadah Bader Mahmoud Albadri, Aon Jafar Abdallah Almasri, Josefina Garcia Aronce, Marlo Maila Garcia Aronce, Alex Vadakkeparampil Augustine, Tirth Raj Bhatt, Carline M. Bisseret, Amina Dalil, Mobeen Salah Ud Din, Altemar Amparo Duran, Adonis Christopher Edwards, Saadia Gabr, Parivash Khodavirdizadeh Ghahramani, Paria Naghipour Ghezeljeh, Larixandra Lara Hernandez, Rubaiyat Islam, Lmia Ayman Jalakh, Rabea Therese Kruegel, Marianne Christel Lorenz, Sven Arne Lorenz, Mariandr Rubio Mackepeace, Malouk Mohamed, Anthony Ishwar Moonesar, Sara Moonesar, Pierre-Richard Noizil, Sea Novaku, Sadorathon Orifzoda, Mohammad Othman, Kamala Paneru, Behnam Pournader, Mohammadhassan Pournader, Md Nahidur Rahman, Anu Sara Raju, Noel A. Ruiz, Muminkhon Saidov, Eftikar Kamel Samara, Hafiza Sulta, Alban Traga, Tracia Chevannese Young, Farhana Kashfi Zahir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- House Judiciary Subcommittee Statement, #2 Exhibit B- House Extensions of Remarks on H.R. 4300, #3 Exhibit C-House Judiciary Subcommittee Statement, #4 Exhibit D- Statement from Debate on H.Rept. 101-955, #5 Exhibit E- Statement from Hearing on S.Amdt.238, #6 Exhibit F- Statement from Hearing on S.Amdt.238, #7 Exhibit G- Statement from Hearing on S.Amdt.260, #8 Exhibit H- Statement from Hearing on S.Amdt.260)(Related document(s) #25 , #8 , #31 ) (Barre, Abadir) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2020; taking under submission #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; #18 Motion to Transfer Case.Total Time in Court: 30 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys: Abadir Barre, Curtis Morrison, Kristina Ghazaryan. Defendant Attorney: Kimberly Robinson. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2020)
November 21, 2020 Filing 30 INITIAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Donald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/21/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byDonald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 12/3/2020 TO 12/4/2020: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/4/2020 01:30 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2020. Initial Case Management Con ference set for 12/4/2020 01:30 PM by Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING RE: #8 #18 MOTIONS: Due to Court unavailability, hearings re: #18 MOTION to Transfer Case , #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 12/3/2020 vacated and rescheduled for 12/4/2020 01:30 PM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing remains unchanged. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www .cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 01:30 PM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed by Tracia Chevannese Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gomez Initial Complaint)(Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY (re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byTracia Chevannese Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SEPT 2020 - IV Issuances by Post and Visa Class, #2 Exhibit B - SEPT 2020 - NIV Issuances by Post and Visa Class, #3 Exhibit C - Letter from Dr. Frank Paul Schubert, #4 Exhibit D - Email from Brendan, NVC Contractor Senture, LLC, #5 Exhibit E - Email from AUSA Kimberly Robinson, #6 Exhibit F- Visa Bulletin November 2020)(Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 24 Second Notice of Errata re #1 Complaint filed by Tracia Chevannese Young (Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief) And [Proposed] Order filed by Donald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Grewe Decl., #2 Declaration Marwaha Decl., #3 Declaration deGarmo Decl., #4 Declaration Neilan Decl., #5 Declaration Austin Decl.)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE: THE COURT HAS REVIEWED THE MOTION TO RELATE AND DETERMINED THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED AND NO REASSIGNMENTS SHALL OCCUR (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 1, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2020 01:30 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/ 2020 01:30 PM by Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. For future applications, Court directs parties to use Court's form application online.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Abadir Jama Barre ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15134785.) filed by H. M.H.H. A., M. J. A., N. M.H.H. A., Y. M.H.H. A., N. M.H.H. A.(2), Naila Abad, El Shaimaa Raouf Aly Abdelfattah, Bushra Ahmad Sada Abusal, Mohamed Hassan Hafez Ahmed, Hayder Waleed Mohammed Al-Saadi, Mayyadah Bader Mahmoud Albadri, Aon Jafar Abdallah Almasri, Josefina Garcia Aronce, Marlo Maila Garcia Aronce, Alex Vadakkeparampil Augustine, Tirth Raj Bhatt, Carline M. Bisseret, Amina Dalil, Mobeen Salah Ud Din, Altemar Amparo Duran, Adonis Christopher Edwards, Saadia Gabr, Parivash Khodavirdizadeh Ghahramani, Paria Naghipour Ghezeljeh, Larixandra Lara Hernandez, Rubaiyat Islam, Lmia Ayman Jalakh, Rabea Therese Kruegel, Marianne Christel Lorenz, Sven Arne Lorenz, Mariandr Rubio Mackepeace, Malouk Mohamed, Anthony Ishwar Moonesar, Sara Moonesar, Pierre-Richard Noizil, Sea Novaku, Sadorathon Orifzoda, Mohammad Othman, Kamala Paneru, Behnam Pournader, Mohammadhassan Pournader, Md Nahidur Rahman, Anu Sara Raju, Noel A. Ruiz, Muminkhon Saidov, Eftikar Kamel Samara, Hafiza Sulta, Alban Traga, Tracia Chevannese Young, Farhana Kashfi Zahir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Barre, Abadir) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE OR 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR A STAY filed by Donald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/12/2020. Replies due by 11/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 25, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Errata re #1 Complaint filed by Tracia Chevannese Young (Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 10/25/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) - Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Administrative Motion and Administrative Motion to Expedite Hearing Date filed by Tracia Chevannese Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex. A Decl. of Curtis Lee Morrison, #2 Declaration Ex. B Decl. of Malek Saleh, #3 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: #8 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND HEARING DATE: Opposition due by 11/4/2020. Reply due by 11/11/2020. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 01:30 PM by Videoconference before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.u scourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Responses due by 11/4/2020. Replies due by 11/11/2 020. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 01:30 PM by Videoconference before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Anne Robinson (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REGARDING A BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Donald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf. Responses due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracia Chevannese Young. Michael R. Pompeo served on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. This service includes the Summons, Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and also included service to Civil Process Clerk, US Attorney's Office for CAND on October 21, 2020). Service to Defendant Donald J. Trump Trump and US Attorney General is still pending. (Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 4:20-cv-4887-JSW. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/16/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are missing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the judge initials on future filings. Re: #8 MOTION for Prelimi nary Injunction filed by Mariandr Rubio Mackepeace, Adonis Christopher Edwards, Rabea Therese Kruegel, M. J. A., Mohammadhassan Pournader, Muminkhon Saidov, Altemar Amparo Duran, Lmia Ayman Jalakh, Md Nahidur Rahman, Rubaiyat Islam, Farhana Kashfi Zahir, Naila Abad, H. M.H.H. A., Amina Dalil, Sadorathon Orifzoda, Kamala Paneru, Marlo Maila Garcia Aronce, Marianne Christel Lorenz, Alban Traga, Carline M. Bisseret, Mohammad Othman, Hafiza Sulta, Sea Novaku, Hayder Waleed Mohammed Al-Saadi, Tracia Chevannese Young, Pierre-Richard Noizil, Josefina Garcia Aronce, Mohamed Hassan Hafez Ahmed, Behnam Pournader, Y. M.H.H. A., Mobeen Salah Ud Din, N. M.H.H. A., Anthony Ishwar Moonesar, N. M.H.H. A.(2), Tirth Raj Bhatt, Malouk Mohamed, Sven Arne Lorenz, Alex Vadakkeparampil Augustine, El Shaimaa Raouf Aly Abdelfattah, Parivash Khodavirdizadeh Ghahramani, Larixandra Lara Hernandez, Paria Naghipour Ghezeljeh, Noel A. Ruiz, Aon Jafar Abdallah Almasri, Mayyadah Bader Mahmoud Albadri, Anu Sara Raju, Bushra Ahmad Sada Abusal, Eftikar Kamel Samara, Saadia Gabr, Sara Moonesar, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, filed by Mohammadhassan Pournader, Muminkhon Saidov, Md Nahidur Rahman, Farhana Kashfi Zahir, Alban Traga, Hafiza Sulta, Tracia Chevannese Young, Behnam Pournader, Noel A. Ruiz, Anu Sara Raju, Eftikar Kamel Samara (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by H. M.H.H. A., M. J. A., N. M.H.H. A., Y. M.H.H. A., N. M.H.H. A.(2), Naila Abad, El Shaimaa Raouf Aly Abdelfattah, Bushra Ahmad Sada Abusal, Mohamed Hassan Hafez Ahmed, Hayder Waleed Mohammed Al-Saadi, Mayyadah Bader Mahmoud Albadri, Aon Jafar Abdallah Almasri, Josefina Garcia Aronce, Marlo Maila Garcia Aronce, Alex Vadakkeparampil Augustine, Tirth Raj Bhatt, Carline M. Bisseret, Amina Dalil, Mobeen Salah Ud Din, Altemar Amparo Duran, Adonis Christopher Edwards, Saadia Gabr, Parivash Khodavirdizadeh Ghahramani, Paria Naghipour Ghezeljeh, Larixandra Lara Hernandez, Rubaiyat Islam, Lmia Ayman Jalakh, Rabea Therese Kruegel, Marianne Christel Lorenz, Sven Arne Lorenz, Mariandr Rubio Mackepeace, Malouk Mohamed, Anthony Ishwar Moonesar, Sara Moonesar, Pierre-Richard Noizil, Sea Novaku, Sadorathon Orifzoda, Mohammad Othman, Kamala Paneru, Behnam Pournader, Mohammadhassan Pournader, Md Nahidur Rahman, Anu Sara Raju, Noel A. Ruiz, Muminkhon Saidov, Eftikar Kamel Samara, Hafiza Sulta, Alban Traga, Tracia Chevannese Young, Farhana Kashfi Zahir. Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2020 09:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/29/2020. Replies due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Exhibit Ex 5, #7 Exhibit Ex 6, #8 Exhibit Ex 7, #9 Exhibit Ex 8, #10 Exhibit Ex 9, #11 Exhibit Ex 10, #12 Exhibit Ex 11, #13 Exhibit Ex 12, #14 Exhibit Ex 13, #15 Exhibit Ex 14, #16 Exhibit Ex 15, #17 Exhibit Ex 16, #18 Exhibit Ex 17, #19 Exhibit Ex 18, #20 Exhibit Ex 19, #21 Exhibit Ex 20, #22 Exhibit Ex 21, #23 Exhibit Ex 22, #24 Exhibit Ex 23, #25 Exhibit Ex 24, #26 Exhibit Ex 25, #27 Exhibit Ex 26, #28 Exhibit Ex 27, #29 Exhibit Ex 28, #30 Exhibit Ex 29, #31 Exhibit Ex 30, #32 Exhibit Ex 31, #33 Exhibit Ex 32, #34 Exhibit Ex 33, #35 Exhibit Ex 34, #36 Exhibit Ex 35, #37 Exhibit Ex 36, #38 Exhibit Ex 37)(Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Behnam Pournader, Mohammadhassan Pournader, Md Nahidur Rahman, Anu Sara Raju, Noel A. Ruiz, Muminkhon Saidov, Eftikar Kamel Samara, Hafiza Sulta, Alban Traga, Tracia Chevannese Young, Farhana Kashfi Zahir.. (Ghazaryan, Kristina) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: KRISTINA GHAZARYAN. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Complaint filed by Ma riandr Rubio Mackepeace, Adonis Christopher Edwards, Rabea Therese Kruegel, M. J. A., Mohammadhassan Pournader, Muminkhon Saidov, Altemar Amparo Duran, Lmia Ayman Jalakh, Md Nahidur Rahman, Rubaiyat Islam, Farhana Kashfi Zahir, Naila Abad, H. M.H.H. A., Amina Dalil, Sadorathon Orifzoda, Kamala Paneru, Marlo Maila Garcia Aronce, Marianne Christel Lorenz, Alban Traga, Carline M. Bisseret, Mohammad Othman, Hafiza Sulta, Sea Novaku, Hayder Waleed Mohammed Al-Saadi, Tracia Chevannese Young, Pierre-Richard Noizil, Josefina Garcia Aronce, Mohamed Hassan Hafez Ahmed, Behnam Pournader, Y. M.H.H. A., Mobeen Salah Ud Din, N. M.H.H. A., Anthony Ishwar Moonesar, N. M.H.H. A.(2), Tirth Raj Bhatt, Malouk Mohamed, Sven Arne Lorenz, Alex Vadakkeparampil Augustine, El Shaimaa Raouf Aly Abdelfattah, Parivash Khodavirdizadeh Ghahramani, Larixandra Lara Hernandez, Paria Naghipour Ghezeljeh, Noel A. Ruiz, Aon Jafar Abdallah Almasri, Mayyadah Bader Mahmoud Albadri, Anu Sara Raju, Bushra Ahmad Sada Abusal, Eftikar Kamel Samara, Saadia Gabr, Sara Moonesar). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tracia Chevannese Young (Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Donald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf, Michael R. Pompeo ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15065163.). Filed byMohamed Hassan Hafez Ahmed, El Shaimaa Raouf Aly Abdelfattah, Sara Moonesar, Marianne Christel Lorenz, Farhana Kashfi Zahir, Adonis Christopher Edwards, Naila Abad, Tracia Chevannese Young, Mobeen Salah Ud Din, Mariandr Rubio Mackepeace, Larixandra Lara Hernandez, M. J. A., Rubaiyat Islam, Paria Naghipour Ghezeljeh, Parivash Khodavirdizadeh Ghahramani, Anu Sara Raju, Eftikar Kamel Samara, Hayder Waleed Mohammed Al-Saadi, Mohammad Othman, Mohammadhassan Pournader, Alban Traga, Saadia Gabr, N. M.H.H. A.(2), Hafiza Sulta, Aon Jafar Abdallah Almasri, Josefina Garcia Aronce, Anthony Ishwar Moonesar, Muminkhon Saidov, Behnam Pournader, Rabea Therese Kruegel, Noel A. Ruiz, Amina Dalil, Bushra Ahmad Sada Abusal, Pierre-Richard Noizil, Tirth Raj Bhatt, H. M.H.H. A., Sea Novaku, Md Nahidur Rahman, Alex Vadakkeparampil Augustine, Mayyadah Bader Mahmoud Albadri, Altemar Amparo Duran, Carline M. Bisseret, Sven Arne Lorenz, Kamala Paneru, N. M.H.H. A., Sadorathon Orifzoda, Y. M.H.H. A., Marlo Maila Garcia Aronce, Lmia Ayman Jalakh, Malouk Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Administrative Record of the Proclamations, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrison, Curtis) (Filed on 10/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bushra Ahmad Sada Abusal
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Md Nahidur Rahman
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Christel Lorenz
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altemar Amparo Duran
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariandr Rubio Mackepeace
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tirth Raj Bhatt
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saadia Gabr
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlo Maila Garcia Aronce
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farhana Kashfi Zahir
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muminkhon Saidov
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amina Dalil
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Vadakkeparampil Augustine
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayyadah Bader Mahmoud Albadri
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eftikar Kamel Samara
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paria Naghipour Ghezeljeh
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Novaku
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre-Richard Noizil
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Othman
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adonis Christopher Edwards
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carline M. Bisseret
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behnam Pournader
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Hassan Hafez Ahmed
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malouk Mohamed
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. M.H.H. A.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ishwar Moonesar
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel A. Ruiz
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadorathon Orifzoda
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sven Arne Lorenz
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobeen Salah Ud Din
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lmia Ayman Jalakh
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alban Traga
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anu Sara Raju
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parivash Khodavirdizadeh Ghahramani
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. M.H.H. A.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. M.H.H. A.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabea Therese Kruegel
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hafiza Sulta
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubaiyat Islam
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayder Waleed Mohammed Al-Saadi
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammadhassan Pournader
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. M.H.H. A.(2)
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. J. A.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Shaimaa Raouf Aly Abdelfattah
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracia Chevannese Young
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Moonesar
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Garcia Aronce
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naila Abad
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamala Paneru
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larixandra Lara Hernandez
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aon Jafar Abdallah Almasri
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Kristina Ghazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?