City Of Portland et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: City Of Oakland and City of Portland
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General William P. Barr, Chad F. Wolf and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2020cv07184
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Clendenen (Clendenen, Michael) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Lynch on Behalf of All Defendants (Lynch, Jason) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City Of Oakland, City of Portland re #20 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #12 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #16 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #19 Order,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, 18 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only,, #13 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #15 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #11 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #21 Certificate of Service (Miller, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Ellen Habig (Habig, Jill) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City Of Oakland, City of Portland re #1 Complaint (Miller, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/30/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15126821.) filed by City Of Oakland, City of Portland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City Of Oakland, City of Portland.. (Stilwell, Victoria) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: granting #14 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15090259.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/20/20 filed by City of Portland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reeve, Tracy) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15090320.) filed by City of Portland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sheffield, Naomi) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15090302.) filed by City of Portland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Vannier, Denis) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15090259.) filed by City of Portland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reeve, Tracy) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15090208.) filed by City of Portland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Taylor, Robert) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Stilwell (Stilwell, Victoria) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Gong, LiJia) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15065507.). Filed byCity Of Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McPherson, Malia) (Filed on 10/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Of Portland et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Zoe Meryl Savitsky
Represented By: Victoria Stilwell
Represented By: Barbara Parker
Represented By: LiJia Gong
Represented By: Malia McPherson
Represented By: Maria Bee
Represented By: Jill Ellen Habig
Represented By: Jonathan B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Portland
Represented By: Victoria Stilwell
Represented By: LiJia Gong
Represented By: Tracy Pool Reeve
Represented By: Naomi Sheffield
Represented By: Robert L Taylor
Represented By: Denis M Vannier
Represented By: Jill Ellen Habig
Represented By: Jonathan B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?