Witsell v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Mark A Witsell
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv07214
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Hawaii; Case Number 1:20-cv-00380. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of Hawaii, 1:20-cv-00380-KJM-NONE, Witsell v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-7214-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 235 cc: JPMDL (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 (CERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 235), MDL NO. 2741, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel - Certified copy from the Northern District of California. (jni)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ENTRY ORDER re #8 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 235), MDL NO. 2741 - Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel.As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.(jni)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 235), MDL NO. 2741 - Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel.Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (jni)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark A Witsell. Monsanto Company served on 9/4/2020. (Green, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (jni)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 11/2/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00380 KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0975-2418521., filed by Mark A Witsell. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witsell v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Witsell
Represented By: Maria F. Penn
Represented By: Denise M. Hevicon
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?