Manuwal v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Sandra Manuwal
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv07396
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Minnesota, 0:20-cv-02102, Manuwal v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-07396-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 239 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-02102. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-239) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria.(kt)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (KDS)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2102 PJS/KMM. (KDS)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8109626) filed by Sandra Manuwal. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuwal v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Manuwal
Represented By: Charles H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?