Abskharon et al v. Air Canada
Plaintiff: Peter A. Abskharon, Barry Winograd and Nikki M. Abskharon
Defendant: Air Canada
Case Number: 3:2020cv07464
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #17 Brief, #16 MOTION to Remand of the UCL Claims for Restitution or, Alternatively, for Dismissal of Those Claims Without Prejudice to Refiling in State Court, #18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Air Canada. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Remand of the UCL Claims for Restitution or, Alternatively, for Dismissal of Those Claims Without Prejudice to Refiling in State Court ) filed byAir Canada. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byNikki M. Abskharon, Peter A. Abskharon, Barry Winograd. (Lison, Wyatt) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
November 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Remand of the UCL Claims for Restitution or, Alternatively, for Dismissal of Those Claims Without Prejudice to Refiling in State Court, #18 MOTION to Transfer Case . Responses due by 12/11/2020. Replies due by 12/22/2020. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #14 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Extend Briefing Schedule. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Air Canada. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 12/4/2020. Replies due by 12/11/2020. (Mayer, Danielle) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 17 Brief re #16 MOTION to Remand of the UCL Claims for Restitution or, Alternatively, for Dismissal of Those Claims Without Prejudice to Refiling in State Court filed byNikki M. Abskharon, Peter A. Abskharon, Barry Winograd. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Lison, Wyatt) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand of the UCL Claims for Restitution or, Alternatively, for Dismissal of Those Claims Without Prejudice to Refiling in State Court filed by Nikki M. Abskharon, Peter A. Abskharon, Barry Winograd. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 12/4/2020. Replies due by 12/11/2020. (Lison, Wyatt) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Wyatt A. Lison in Support of #14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Entering Briefing Schedule filed byNikki M. Abskharon, Peter A. Abskharon, Barry Winograd. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Lison, Wyatt) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Entering Briefing Schedule filed by Nikki M. Abskharon, Peter A. Abskharon, Barry Winograd. (Lison, Wyatt) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2020, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Tuesday, November 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Ma nagement Statement due by 11/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2020, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Air Canda to Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint filed by Air Canada. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nikki M. Abskharon, Peter A. Abskharon, Barry Winograd.. (Lison, Wyatt) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Wyatt A. Lison (Lison, Wyatt) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/6/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action by Air Canada (Mayer, Danielle) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air Canada (Mayer, Danielle) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Canada (Mayer, Danielle) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action to Federal District Court from Alameda Superior Court of California with jury demand. Their case number is RG20071263. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15105963). Filed by Air Canada. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley L. Shively, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration of Kevin Strohmaier, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayer, Danielle) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abskharon et al v. Air Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A. Abskharon
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Winograd
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki M. Abskharon
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Canada
Represented By: Danielle Michelle Mayer
Represented By: Ashley Lynn Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?