Samson v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marilou Samson
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07714
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE MOTION HEARING FROM 1/7/2021, TO 1/28/2021, RE #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Superior Court of San Francisco; Case No. CGC-20-586920), AND #20 MOTION for Joinder In Removal. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2021, 10:00 AM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is requir ed of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, January 25, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-onl y entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Superior Court of San Francisco; Case No. CGC-20-586920) ) PLAINTIFF/PETITIONERS REPLY TO DEFENDANT J.P. MORGAN CHASE & COS (aka J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF/PETITIONERS MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT filed byMarilou Samson. (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) PLAINTIFF/PETITIONERS: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT J.P. MORGAN CHASE & COS (aka J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.) REPLY TO PLAINTIFF/PETITIONERS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byMarilou Samson. (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) PLAINTIFF/PETITIONERS: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATIONS REPLY TO PLAINTIFF/PETITIONERS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6); LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byMarilou Samson. (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byJPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Superior Court of San Francisco; Case No. CGC-20-586920) ) filed byJPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Marilou Samson PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION; NOTICE OF REMAND TO STATE COURT (SUPERIOR COURT OF COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO) (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEUDLING THE HEARING RE #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Superior Court of San Francisco; Case No. CGC-20-586920).The motion was not set in compliance with the Local Rules and was not filed correctly on the docket. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021, 10:00 AM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Not less than 3 court days in advance of the hearing.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION for Joinder In Removal ) PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QLS' NOTICE OF CONSENT AND JOINDER IN REMOVAL; LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byMarilou Samson. (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byQuality Loan Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QLS'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6); LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byMarilou Samson. (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed byMarilou Samson. (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Joinder In Removal filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Superior Court of San Francisco; Case No. CGC-20-586920) filed by Marilou Samson. Responses due by 12/7/2020. Replies due by 12/14/2020. (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Marilou Samson of opposition to notice of removal of action (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service proof of service)(Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 11/21/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS FOR MOTION HEARING ON 1/7/2021, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021, 10:00 AM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances : Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Not less than 3 court days in advance of the hearing.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021, 10:00 AM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marilou Samson.. (Dichoso, Jess) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AS MODIFIED by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/30/2020. Replies due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Motion to Change Time to File Reply on Motion Dismiss Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph E. Addiego III, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byJPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/23/2020. Replies due by 11/30/2020. (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances:< /b< Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, January 28, 2021, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Man agement Statement due by 1/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/5/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JPMorgan Chase & Co... (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase & Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 REMINDER: Attorney Jess Dichoso contact information lists address as 450 65th St, Oakland, CA 94609. Jess Dichoso must update his/her ECF profile for the change of contact information to be in effect. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase & Co. identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase & Co. identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332 and 1441 from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-586920. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15142599). Filed byJPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 11/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samson v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Frederick Alan Haist
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilou Samson
Represented By: Jess Dichoso
Represented By: Jess Dichoso,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?