Better Mouse Company, LLC v. Acer America Corporation
Plaintiff: Better Mouse Company, LLC
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv07895
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/5/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Better Mouse Company, LLC.. (Ni, Hao) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/5/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Ni). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15253384.) filed by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2020. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Acer America Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/24/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Better Mouse Company, LLC . (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Better Mouse Company, LLC (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Better Mouse Company, LLC (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Acer America Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15171483.). Filed byBetter Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Better Mouse Company, LLC v. Acer America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Better Mouse Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven Whitefield Ritcheson
Represented By: Hao Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?