Broadbear v. Early
Plaintiff: Adrienne Broadbear
Defendant: John P Early
Case Number: 3:2020cv08060
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, #19 Order,,., Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #19 Order,, Motion Hearing reset to 2/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 3/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AFFORDING PARTIES LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Each of the parties is afforded leave to file, no later than January 18, 2021, a supplemental brief, not to exceed five pages in length. The hearing on defendant's motion to compel is continued to February 5, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 19, 2021, to March 19, 2021, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 4, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action ) filed byJohn P Early. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Early, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration of Robert Sheppard, #6 Declaration of Peter N. Hadiaris)(Hadiaris, Peter) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER (re #15 Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed byAdrienne Broadbear. (Collier, Stephen) (Filed on 12/14/2020) Modified on 12/15/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (re #15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Stay Action ) Declalaration of Adrienne Broadbear in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAdrienne Broadbear. (Collier, Stephen) (Filed on 12/14/2020) Modified on 12/15/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/15/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action ) filed byAdrienne Broadbear. (Collier, Stephen) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of SERVICE by Adrienne Broadbear. (Collier, Stephen) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Adrienne Broadbear of Case Management Conference Order (Collier, Stephen) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 6, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Docket #8) (Hadiaris, Peter) (Filed on 12/6/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/1/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by John P Early. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/14/2020. Replies due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Declaration of John P Early Supporting Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action)(Hadiaris, Peter) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 29, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John P Early of Standing Orders (Hadiaris, Peter) (Filed on 11/29/2020)
November 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by John P Early. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/14/2020. Replies due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Early, #2 Proposed Order)(Hadiaris, Peter) (Filed on 11/28/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John P Early.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hadiaris, Peter) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/1/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John P Early (Hadiaris, Peter) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-587019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15197665). Filed byJohn P Early. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hadiaris, Peter) (Filed on 11/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadbear v. Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Broadbear
Represented By: Stephen L. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Early
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Hadiaris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?