Express Mobile, Inc. v. Adobe Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Defendant: X.Commerce, Inc. doing business as d/b/a Magento, Adobe Inc. doing business as d/b/a Adobe Systems Incorporated, Adobe Inc. doing business as Adobe Systems Incorporated and X.Commerce, Inc. doing business as Magento
Case Number: 3:2020cv08297
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 89 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jamie L. Lucia (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 10/3/2022)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR STAY. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 11, 2022 Filing 86 EXHIBITS re #85 Notice (Other) filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Related document(s) #85 ) (Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
July 11, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE by Express Mobile, Inc. of Supplemental Facts regarding Defendants' Motions to Stay (Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
June 16, 2022 Filing 84 CLERK'S NOTICE: MOTION TO STAY [#80] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON JUNE 23, 2022 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2022)
June 2, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE by Express Mobile, Inc. of Supplemental Facts Regarding Defendants' Joinder in Master Stay Motion (Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 82 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #80 MOTION for Joinder in Master Stay Motion, with Additional Argument. Motion Hearing previously set for 5/26/2022 has been continued to 6/23/2022 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 81 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION for Joinder in Master Stay Motion, with Additional Argument ) filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Suarez, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 80 MOTION for Joinder in Master Stay Motion, with Additional Argument filed by Adobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan J. Casamiquela, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Casamiquela, Ryan) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE POTENTIAL STAY MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/2022. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2022)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #77 Motion to Amend/Correct. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022)
December 31, 2021 Filing 77 Unopposed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions under Patent L.R. 3-6 filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/14/2022. Replies due by 1/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Kappers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Proposed Order) (Kappers, Robert) (Filed on 12/31/2021) Modified on 1/3/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2021 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held via Zoom on 12/8/2021.Total Time in Court: 1 hour and 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: James Nuttal, Tron Fu, Timothy Devlin. Defendant Attorney: Michael Berta, Ryan Casamiquela.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 75 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/8/2021 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearan ce or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at rscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12/7/2021 at 12:00 pm.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/8/2021 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document assoc iated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 74 Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Hejny)(Nuttall, James) (Filed on 11/23/2021) Modified on 11/28/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2021 Filing 73 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Defendants' Claim Construction Brief filed by Adobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Schmandt, #2 Declaration of J. David Hadden, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2021 Filing 72 Brief Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Suarez)(Nuttall, James) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #70 Stipulation and Protective Order, as modified in Section 6.3. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order filed by Adobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan J. Casamiquela, #2 Exhibit A)(Casamiquela, Ryan) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 69 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent L.R. 4-3 filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Nuttall, James) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION [#56 ] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON SEPTEMBER 16, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO LIFT STAY. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/9/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #64 Stipulation Re: Disclosure of Patent License and Settlement Agreements. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #60 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Lift the Stay of Claim Construction as to the '397 and '168 Patents ) filed byAdobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Irene Yang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Yang, Irene) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Disclosure of Patent License and Settlement Agreements filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Nuttall, James) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION TO BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF EXPRESS MOBILE, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AS TO THE 397 AND 168 PATENTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/31/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #60 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Lift the Stay of Claim Construction as to the '397 and '168 Patents filed by Adobe Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam R. Brausa)(Casamiquela, Ryan) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 61 REPLY (re #56 MOTION to Amend Infringement Contentions under Patent L.R. 3-6 ) filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christopher A. Suarez, #2 Exhibit 1)(Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 60 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Lift the Stay of Claim Construction as to the '397 and '168 Patents filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Responses due by 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott W. Hejny, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Nuttall, James) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael L. Roberts. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16320007.) filed by Adobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc.. (Roberts, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #56 MOTION to Amend Infringement Contentions under Patent L.R. 3-6 ) filed byAdobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sue Wang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Yang, Irene) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION to Amend Infringement Contentions under Patent L.R. 3-6 filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/20/2021. Replies due by 8/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Suarez, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Proposed Order)(Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 8/6/2021) Modified on 8/9/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE to the Court of PTO's Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate by Express Mobile, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nuttall, James) (Filed on 7/30/2021) Modified on 8/3/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Notice of Reference and Order Re: Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/22/2021. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 18, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE by Express Mobile, Inc. of Withdrawal of Laurie Edelstein as Counsel for Plaintiff Express Mobile, Inc. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 15, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie L. Lucia as Counsel for Plaintiff Express Mobile, Inc. (Lucia, Jamie) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
April 27, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/8/2021 10:00 AM. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/26/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 50 Statement re #42 Order, Set Hearings Joint Statement regarding Coordination of Claim Construction Proceedings by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Proposed Schedules)(Nuttall, James) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #45 Motion to Stay. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #45 MOTION to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexaminations of the '397 and '168 Patents ) filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Johnson, Katherine) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 MOTION to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexaminations of the '397 and '168 Patents. Responses due by 4/1/2021. Replies due by 4/8/2021. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #46 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION TO BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY.(clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 29, 2021 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #45 MOTION to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexaminations of the '397 and '168 Patents filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Johnson)(Johnson, Katherine) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexaminations of the '397 and '168 Patents filed by Adobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 3/31/2021. Replies due by 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE POTENTIAL STAY MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/12/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION [#35] TO DISMISS SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON MARCH 18, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE COORDINATION OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/9/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg Denying #36 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 40 REPLY (re #35 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) ) filed byAdobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) (DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO EXPRESS MOBILE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE) filed byAdobe Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #35 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) ) filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Johnson)(Johnson, Katherine) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/25/2021 is continued to 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 3/2/2021. Replies due by 3/9/2021. (Nuttall, James) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Adobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 2/25/2021. Replies due by 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Berta, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 2/11/2021) Modified on 2/12/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Casamiquela (Casamiquela, Ryan) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas H Lee (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Berta (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
December 24, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Wang (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 24, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Irene Inkyu Yang (Yang, Irene) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Bettinger (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #27 Regarding Waiver of Service of Summons, Extension of Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint, and Rescheduling of Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/25/2021 is continued to 3/25/2021 at 10:00 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/23/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Waiver of Service of Summons, Extension of Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint, and Rescheduling of Initial Case Management Conference filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Katherine) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 26 Refund Status re #10 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 25 Refund Status re #11 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Express Mobile, Inc. re 8 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Tron Y. Fu. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher A. Suarez. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert F. Kappers. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine H. Johnson.(clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Dockterman. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James R. Nuttall. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15254137.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fu, Tron) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15254102.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Suarez, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15254057.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kappers, Robert) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15254008.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Katherine) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15253974.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dockterman, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15253899.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nuttall, James) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15234678 by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15234503 by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Express Mobile, Inc... (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by Express Mobile, Inc. . (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Express Mobile, Inc. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Express Mobile, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Express Mobile, Inc. for Express Mobile, Inc.. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Mobile, Inc. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/24/2020) Modified on 11/25/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Jury Trial Demanded against Adobe Inc., X.Commerce, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-15234757.). Filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Edelstein, Laurie) (Filed on 11/24/2020) Modified on 11/25/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Mobile, Inc. v. Adobe Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X.Commerce, Inc. doing business as d/b/a Magento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Inc. doing business as d/b/a Adobe Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Inc. doing business as Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Irene Inkyu Yang
Represented By: Sue Wang
Represented By: Nicholas H. Lee
Represented By: Ryan J. Casamiquela
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Represented By: Michael L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X.Commerce, Inc. doing business as Magento
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Irene Inkyu Yang
Represented By: Sue Wang
Represented By: Nicholas H. Lee
Represented By: Ryan J. Casamiquela
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Represented By: Michael L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Laurie Edelstein
Represented By: Robert F. Kappers
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Represented By: Katherine H. Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Alan Suarez
Represented By: Tron Yue Fu
Represented By: James Richard Nuttall
Represented By: Jamie L. Lucia
Represented By: Katherine Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?