Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.213.155.207
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.213.155.207
Case Number: 3:2020cv08363
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons gran ted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Ex Parte Application.(lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Copy of #4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright, emailed to Copyright office (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
November 27, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/11/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 27, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosures Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.213.155.207, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-15248193). Filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 11/27/2020) Modified on 12/3/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.213.155.207
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.213.155.207
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?