Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc. et al v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc. and Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc.
Defendant: Tom Simpson, Jordan Allen, Tim Barash, Jon Wood, Jeff Elowe and Brian Sheppard
Case Number: 3:2020cv08684
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jordan Allen, Tim Barash, Jeff Elowe, Brian Sheppard, Tom Simpson, Jon Wood identifying Corporate Parent Jordan Allen, Corporate Parent Tim Barash, Corporate Parent Brian Sheppard, Corporate Parent Tom Simpson, Corporate Parent Jeff Elowe, Corporate Parent Jon Wood, Other Affiliate Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc., Other Affiliate Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc. for Brian Sheppard, Jeff Elowe, Jon Wood, Jordan Allen, Tim Barash, Tom Simpson. (Bodzin, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 29 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJordan Allen, Tim Barash, Jeff Elowe, Brian Sheppard, Tom Simpson, Jon Wood. (Bodzin, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny A Barak (Barak, Danny) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Bodzin (Bodzin, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 26 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/8/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court p roceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF ) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
December 29, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc... (Thole, Gavin) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.. Service waived by Tom Simpson waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Thole, Gavin) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.. Service waived by Tim Barash waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Thole, Gavin) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.. Service waived by Jordan Allen waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Thole, Gavin) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.. Service waived by Jon Wood waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Thole, Gavin) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.. Service waived by Jeff Elowe waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Thole, Gavin) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.. Service waived by Brian Sheppard waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Thole, Gavin) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Jordan Allen, Tim Barash, Jeff Elowe, Brian Sheppard, Tom Simpson, and Jon Wood. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please submit one summons with an attachment listing all defendants to be served. Please re-file to correct this issue. Re: #11 Proposed Summons filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc., #10 Proposed Summons filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc., #8 Proposed Summons filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc., #7 Proposed Summons filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc., #9 Proposed Summons filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 Civil Cover Sheet by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc. . (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20. Re: #1 . #2 Complaint, filed by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/22/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Michael Thole (Thole, Gavin) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mickle Werdegar (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, LLC for Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.; Corporate Parent Venture Lending & Leasing IX, LLC for Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc.. re #1 Complaint, (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, LLC for Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.; Corporate Parent Venture Lending & Leasing IX, LLC for Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc.. re #1 Complaint, (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION, FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT, NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION, AND AIDING AND ABETTING against Jordan Allen, Tim Barash, Jeff Elowe, Brian Sheppard, Tom Simpson, Jon Wood ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15290592.). Filed byVenture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc., Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc. et al v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Simpson
Represented By: Danny A Barak
Represented By: Robert M. Bodzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Allen
Represented By: Danny A Barak
Represented By: Robert M. Bodzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Barash
Represented By: Danny A Barak
Represented By: Robert M. Bodzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Wood
Represented By: Danny A Barak
Represented By: Robert M. Bodzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Elowe
Represented By: Danny A Barak
Represented By: Robert M. Bodzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sheppard
Represented By: Danny A Barak
Represented By: Robert M. Bodzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venture Lending & Leasing VIII, Inc.
Represented By: Gavin Michael Thole
Represented By: Matthew Mickle Werdegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venture Lending & Leasing IX, Inc.
Represented By: Gavin Michael Thole
Represented By: Matthew Mickle Werdegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?