Doe v. Saul
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Defendant: C'mmr Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv08742
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Jane Doe re #6 First Administrative Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and Seal the Administrative Record filed by Jane Doe. Document filed under seal. (Related document(s) #6 ) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/21. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2021)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 First Administrative Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and Seal the Administrative Record filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Yalom Declaration, #2 Unredacted Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/17/2020) Modified on 12/18/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul . Filed by Jane Doe. (Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/11/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15299746). Filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruce, Steven) (Filed on 12/10/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Steven F. Bruce, PWDF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C'mmr Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?