Poorsina v. Tseng et al
Plaintiff: Ali R. Poorsina and Ali Poorsina
Defendant: Boi Anh Hong, Terrenz Kukant Cam and Tan Tseng
Case Number: 3:2020cv09122
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ali Poorsina.. (Poorsina, Ali) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ali Poorsina.. (Poorsina, Ali) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Terrenz Kukant Cam, Boi Anh Hong, Tan Tseng. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Ali R. Poorsina Regarding Manually Filed Item. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terrenz Kukant Cam, Boi Anh Hong, Tan Tseng (Filing fee $ 402; Receipt No. 34611152205). Filed byAli R. Poorsina. Consent/Declination due by 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (part 1), #2 Exhibits (part 2), #3 Envelope, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poorsina v. Tseng et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boi Anh Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrenz Kukant Cam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tan Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali R. Poorsina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Poorsina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?