Stickles et al v. Atria Senior Living, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: George Stickles and Michele Rhodes
Defendant: Atria Senior Living, Inc. and Atria Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv09220
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/16/2022 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/28/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further settlement planning call held on 3/28/2022 in advance of 5/16/2022 Zoom settlement conference, which will start at 1:00 PM. Results: The parties shall meet and confer and shall confirm last settlement positions in a joint email to Judge Ryu by 5/2/2022 (DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov). By 5/6/2022, the parties shall submit updated confidential settlement letters to Judge Ryu in conformance with Docket No. 34. The parties may exchange updated settlement briefs but are not required to do so.Digital Recording Time: Not Recorded For Class: Matthew HayesFor Defendants: Christopher Crosman and Richard Lapp (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Supreme Court's Ruling In Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana filed by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2022 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/7/2022. Replies due by 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Christopher A. Crosman, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings)(Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2022 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/7/2022. Replies due by 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Christopher A. Crosman, #3 Declaration of Michelle Damante, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action)(Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL TRIAL PLAN signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON 3/10/2022: Pursuant to Local Rule 7-2(b), Court will decide motions #49 and #52 on the papers. In-person hearing set for 3/10/2022 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF MOTION HEARING RE: #49 #52 FROM 8:00AM TO 2:00PM ON 3/10/2022: The time for Motion hearing re: #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan, #52 MOTION to Strike #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan is changed from 8:00am to 2:00pm on 3/10/2022. Motion Hearing reset for 3/10/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAtria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Related document(s) #63 , #47 , #51 ) (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND SETTLEMENT FACTORS signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2022).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to #74 Order, the following deadlines are modified: Hearing re #47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Ninth Separate Defense, #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, for An Order Treating Specified Facts As Established is rescheduled to 5/12/2022 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Motion briefing deadlines remain unchanged. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/1/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Jury Selection/Jury Trial reset for 6/6/2022 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Further Jury Trial set for 6/7/2022, 6/8/2022, 6/9/2022, 6/10/2022 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER APPROVING CLASS NOTICE AND PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION, AS MODIFIED signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY (re #52 MOTION to Strike #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan ) filed byGeorge Stickles. (Pawlenko, Kye) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPLY in Support (re #47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Ninth Separate Defense) filed by Michele Rhodes, George Stickles. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 2/18/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY to Opposition (re #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan) filed by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 2/18/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Opposition (re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, for An Order Treating Specified Facts As Established) filed by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 2/18/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE re #61 Objection, to Declaration of Sanela Graziose re Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Compel Trial Plan by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Crosman in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Declaration of Sanela Graziose)(Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Ninth Separate Defense, #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, for An Order Treating Specified Facts As Established filed by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ERRATA re #63 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 (Revised) Compendium of Evidence In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgement As To Ninth Separate Defense)(Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/16/21, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 8:51 - 9:33. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #58 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022. (Related documents(s) #58 ) (Jauregui, Tara) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND MOTION TO MODIFY CLASS PERIOD signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #52 MOTION to Strike #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan ) filed byAtria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Ninth Separate Defense ) filed byAtria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Evidence in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Ninth Separate Defense)(Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, for An Order Treating Specified Facts As Established ) filed byMichele Rhodes, George Stickles. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OBJECTIONS to #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, for An Order Treating Specified Facts As Established, #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan by Michele Rhodes, George Stickles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew B. Hayes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan ) filed byMichele Rhodes, George Stickles. (Pawlenko, Kye) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY in Support (re #46 MOTION for Reconsideration re #40 Order) filed by George Stickles. (Pawlenko, Kye) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 16, 2021 before Judge William Alsup by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement conference held on 2/7/2022 via Zoom. Results: Matter did not settle. Judge Ryu will host a telephonic settlement status call with counsel on 3/28/2022 9:15 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only (up to 30 minutes). Counsel will receive conference call-in credentials via email.Recording in Zoom: Not Recorded For Plaintiffs: Matthew Hayes; Kye Pawlenko; George Stickles; and Michele Rhodes For Defendants: Richard Lapp; Christopher Crosman; Phillip Ebsworth and Zachary Hoyt (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2022).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION for Reconsideration re #40 Order ) filed byAtria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE /Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Alternative Relief by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Crosman in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Alternative Relief, #2 Declaration of Sanela Graziose)(Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING #47 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FROM 3/3/2022 TO 3/10/2022 AT 8:00AM: Hearing re #47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Ninth Separate Defense reset for 3/10/2022 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Settlement Conference set for 2/7/2022 10:00 AM has been rescheduled to 2/7/2022 12:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Strike #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan filed by George Stickles. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 2/14/2022. Replies due by 2/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pawlenko, Kye) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, for An Order Treating Specified Facts As Established filed by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 2/10/2022. Replies due by 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Compendium of Evidence, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ERRATA re #49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan Re Exhibit 2 to the Compendium of Evidence by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Evidence - Corrected)(Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Compel Trial Plan filed by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 2/10/2022. Replies due by 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Compendium of Evidence, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Trial Plan)(Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE: As a Senior District Judge, the Honorable William Alsup will no longer hear civil law and motion matters on any and all Thursdays. Instead, those matters must be noticed for either second or fourth Thursday of each month. Going forward, case management conferences should be noticed for 11AM and all other civil matters for 8AM on the second or fourth Thursday. For those matters previously set for a different Thursday, the Court will possibly reset some or all of them and, if so, will give adequate notice. Otherwise, for previously set civil matters, counsel need not reset them. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Ninth Separate Defense filed by George Stickles. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2022 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 2/10/2022. Replies due by 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Appendix Compendium of Evidence in Support of Motion, #3 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re #40 Order filed by George Stickles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR RECONSIDERATION signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REQUEST for Permission to File Opposition and Set Briefing Schedule re #42 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Class Period Start Date or, in the alternative, Motion for Leave to Name Additional Class Representative and Modify the Class Period by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 1/18/2022) Modified on 1/19/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING HEARING RE #42 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE: Hearing re #42 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Class Period Start Date or, in the alternative, Motion for Leave to Name Additional Class Representative and Modify the Class Period was not set on calendar but included on caption of pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2022 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Class Period Start Date or, in the alternative, Motion for Leave to Name Additional Class Representative and Modify the Class Period filed by George Stickles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Motion for Reconsideration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Proposed Redlined Second Amended Complaint), #3 Declaration Matthew B. Hayes, #4 Declaration Rellie Kirwan, #5 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION re #40 Order Joint Proposed Class Notice & Distribution Plan filed by George Stickles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 12/16/2021 before Judge William Alsup regarding motion for class certification. Hearing held. The Court takes the motion under submission. Recorded via AT&T: 8:51 - 9:33. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Hayes. Defendant Attorneys: Christopher Crosman and Phillip Ebsworth. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2021) Modified on 2/14/2022: Matter transcribed by Tara (Bauer) Jauregui (ECHO Reporting). (rjd, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE VACCINATION REQUIREMENTS signed by Judge William Alsup.(whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING: Motion for Class Certification #31 set for 12/16/2021 at 08:00 AM - Telephonic Only before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only before Judge William Alsup. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2021) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY (re #31 MOTION for Class Certification ) filed by George Stickles. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byAtria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Compendium of Evidence)(Ebsworth, Phillip) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 2/7/2022 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only.Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/15/2021. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement Conference held on 11/15/2021.Total Time: 30 minutes. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Hayes. Defendant Attorney: Christopher Crosman. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference rescheduled to 1/10/2022 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/8/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by George Stickles. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/3/2021. Replies due by 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Appendix Compendium of Evidence in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #3 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE PRIVACY NOTICE AND OPT-OUT. By Judge Alsup.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Michele Rhodes, George Stickles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Privacy Notice), #2 Exhibit B (Opt Out Postcard), #3 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH MODIFICATION. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order filed by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Atria Senior Living, Inc., Atria Management Company, LLC . Filed by George Stickles, Michele Rhodes. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 4/22/2021) Modified on 4/23/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION PURSUANT TO FRCP 15(A)(2) GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michele Rhodes, George Stickles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redlined First Amended Complaint))(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2022 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/26/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss preparation for a settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 20-30 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 11/15/2021 09:30 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Lead Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Disclosures due by 4/2/2021. Leave to Add New Parties or Amend Pleadings due by 5/27/2021. Close of Non-Expert Discovery 12/17/2021. Designation of Expert Testimony and Disclosure of Expert Reports due by 12/17/2021. Motion for Class Certification due by 10/20/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Jury Selection set for 5/2/2022 through 5/6/2022 at 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement.Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/18/2021. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/18/2021 by AT&T Conference line. See Case Management Order for deadlines. Total Time in Court: 4 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Hayes. Defendant Attorney: Christopher Crosman. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2021)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michele Rhodes, George Stickles. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michele Rhodes, George Stickles (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint ; Affirmative Defenses byAtria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc.. (Crosman, Christopher) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Stickles, Michele Rhodes. Atria Management Company, LLC served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Stickles, Michele Rhodes. Atria Senior Living, Inc. served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michele Rhodes, George Stickles.. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Atria Management Company, LLC, Atria Senior Living, Inc. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kye Douglas Pawlenko (Pawlenko, Kye) (Filed on 12/19/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byGeorge Stickles, Michele Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayes, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stickles et al v. Atria Senior Living, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atria Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Burk Lapp
Represented By: Christopher Adam Crosman
Represented By: Phillip James Ebsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atria Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Richard Burk Lapp
Represented By: Christopher Adam Crosman
Represented By: Phillip James Ebsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Stickles
Represented By: Kye Douglas Pawlenko
Represented By: Matthew Bryan Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Rhodes
Represented By: Kye Douglas Pawlenko
Represented By: Matthew Bryan Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?