Kain v. ACM Research, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Kain
Defendant: David Hui Wang, Lisa Feng, Mark A. McKechnie and ACM Research, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv09241
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #17 Stipulation regarding response to complaint. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT filed by ACM Research, Inc., Lisa Feng, Mark A. McKechnie, David Hui Wang. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/26/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ACM Research, Inc., Lisa Feng, Mark A. McKechnie, David Hui Wang.. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACM Research, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate China Continent Property & Casualty Insurance Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Shanghai Science and Technology Venture Capital Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Pudong Science and Technology (Cayman) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Yinan Xiang, Other Affiliate Zhengfan Yang, Other Affiliate AIG Insurance Hong Kong Limited, Other Affiliate China Pacific Property Insurance Co. Ltd. Beijing Branch, Other Affiliate Guoren Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Ltd., Shanghai Branch, Other Affiliate All Trust Insurance Company Limited Suzhou Branch, Other Affiliate China United Property Insurance Company Limited Jiangsu Branch, Other Affiliate Yong An Insurance Company Limited Shanghai Branch for ACM Research, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Elise M Lopez (Lopez, Elise) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew S Liming (Liming, Drew) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Doru Gavril (Gavril, Doru) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Feldman (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court p roceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF ) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jeffrey Kain NOTICE OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants ACM Research, Inc., Lisa Feng, Mark A. McKechnie, David Hui Wang. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ACM Research, Inc., Lisa Feng, Mark A. McKechnie, David Hui Wang, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15346360). Filed by Jeffrey Kain. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2020) Modified on 12/22/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kain v. ACM Research, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Kain
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Peretz Bronstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hui Wang
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Drew S Liming
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elise M Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Feng
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Drew S Liming
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elise M Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. McKechnie
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Drew S Liming
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elise M Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACM Research, Inc.
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Drew S Liming
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elise M Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?