Pangea Legal Services et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Dolores Street Community Services, Inc. and Pangea Legal Services
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tony H. Pham, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, William P. Barr, Chad F. Wolf, James McHenry, U.S. Customs and Border Protection and Mark A. Morgan
Petitioner: Immigration Equality
Amicus Curiae: Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals, Kids in Need of Defense, Immigration Law Professors, Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights, State of California, Public Counsel, Former Immigration Judges and City of Los Angeles
Case Number: 3:2020cv09253
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Chaim Benzion Schwarz Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel (Schwarz, Chaim) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, Pangea Dkt. No. 75; Immigration Equality Dkt. No. 60, the cases are stayed pending further order. The parties will submit a joint status report by April 19, 2021, advising the Court of the status of the government's review of the regulation at issue in these cases, and of any relevant policy changes or other material developments. The request to file for reconsideration, Pangea Dkt. No. 74, is terminated without prejudice. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/28/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 27, 2021 Filing 75 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Hold Cases in Abeyance filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Greer, Christina) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Proposed Motion, #3 Proposed Order)(Flentje, August) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 15, 2021 Remark: Received electronic copy of Administrative Record from the Executive Office for Immigration Review and the Department of Homeland Security. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John Edward Willshire. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nancy Jean Kelly. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/7/2021 before Judge James Donato by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15444631) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Willshire, John) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15444307) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Kelly, Nancy) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/7/2021 before Judge James Donato by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 9, 2021 Filing 67 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 7, 2021, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (56 in 3:20-cv-09258-JD) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2021. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/8/2021. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/7/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 64 REPLY (re #27 Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order And Order To Show Cause; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support ) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. The motion hearings in Case No. 20-cv-9253 and Case No. 20-cv-9258 set for January 7, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by January 6, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/5/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Zachary Abraham Albun. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sabrineh Ardalan. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian C. Earl. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by August Flentje (Flentje, August) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Chaim Benzion Schwarz. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Danielle Therease Morrison. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ellen Scordino. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Steven H. Schulman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shoba Siviprasad Wadhia. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter S. Margolies. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Neil G. Nandi. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Laura K. McNally. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 31, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Kids in Need of Defense, Public Counsel, Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights. (Krumplitsch, Susan) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 49 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Susan Marie Krumplitsch on behalf of Kids in Need of Defense, Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights, Public Counsel. (Krumplitsch, Susan) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #27 Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order And Order To Show Cause; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support) filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Blackwell Declaration, #3 Exhibit Swartz Declaration)(Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 47 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to File an Amicus Brief filed by City of Los Angeles. Responses due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Dundas, Michael) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Dundas on behalf of Amicus Curiae City of Los Angeles (Dundas, Michael) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15386264) filed by Kids in Need of Defense, Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Morrison, Danielle) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15386235) filed by Kids in Need of Defense, Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Scordino, Ellen) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 43 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Marissa Suzanne Malouff on behalf of State of California. (Malouff, Marissa) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15380535) filed by Former Immigration Judges, Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals. (Schulman, Steven) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to File an Amicus Brief filed by Former Immigration Judges, Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals. Responses due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Permit Filing of Amici Curiae; [Proposed] Order)(Stortz, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 40 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Michael James Stortz on behalf of Former Immigration Judges, Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals. (Stortz, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 39 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Immigration Law Professors. Responses due by 1/12/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration of Cameron Dowlatshahi in Support of Unopposed Administrative Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, #3 [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Administrative Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief)(Dowlatshahi, Camron) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Shoba Sivaprasad Wadhia, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15378199) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wadhia, Shoba) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Peter S. Margulies, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15378173) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Margulies, Peter) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Neil G. Nandi, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15378160) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nandi, Neil) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Laura K. McNally, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15378146) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McNally, Laura) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Camron Dowlatshahi as counsel for Amicus Curiae Immigration Law Professors (Dowlatshahi, Camron) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE STATES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - - Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Marissa Suzanne Malouff on behalf of State of California. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief, #(2) Proposed Order)(Malouff, Marissa) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/29/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUBMISSION REGARDING RELATING CASES [Dkt. No. 30] re #30 Response filed by Immigration Equality. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Immigration Equality's Response to Defendants' Submission Regarding Relating Cases [Dkt. No. 30])(Manes, Austin) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to re #25 Sua Sponte Referral Order filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, Dkt. No. #28 , defendants may file an opposition to the application for a temporary restraining order (TRO), Dkt. No. #27 , by December 31, 2020. Plaintiffs may file a reply by January 5, 2021. A hearing on the TRO application is tentatively set for January 7, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. California time, subject to possible resolution of the application on the papers without a hearing. As a one-time accommodation, each side may use up to five additional pages for the opening and opposition briefs. No additional pages are granted for the reply. See Dkt. No. #26 . Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/23/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Unoppsed Motion For An Order Entering Briefing Schedule and Setting Hearing Date filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Naomi A. Igra In Support of Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion For an Order Entering Briefing Schedule and Setting Hearing Date, #2 Proposed Order)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order And Order To Show Cause; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Declaration of Etan Newman, #3 Declaration of Katherine Mahoney, #4 Declaration of Victoria Neilson, #5 Declaration of Adina Appelbaum, #6 Declaration of Naomi A. Igra In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause with Exhibit 1-29, #7 Proposed Order)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 26 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Of Naomi Igra In Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Page Limit, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/23/20. (jswlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO RELATE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services re #21 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, and Other New Case Documents (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina P Greer (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Defendants William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine Meredith Bookey (Bookey, Blaine) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Pellegrom Daher (Daher, Anne) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Barbara Musalo (Musalo, Karen) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lorraine Crook (Crook, Jamie) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15349587) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Albun, Zachary) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15349528) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Ardalan, Sabrineh) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sameer Ahmed (Ahmed, Sameer) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15349380) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Earl, Brian) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15349212) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (Schwarz, Chaim) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Aaron Axel (Axel, Douglas) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Patrick Kelly (Kelly, Steven) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Pangea Legal Services.. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition And Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. And Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dolores Street Community Services, Inc. And Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pangea Legal Services And Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, Adminstrative Procedure Act Case against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15348321). Filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Inc., Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/21/2020) Modified on 12/21/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pangea Legal Services et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Abraham Albun
Represented By: Steven Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Brian C Earl
Represented By: Jamie Lorraine Crook
Represented By: Blaine Meredith Bookey
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Represented By: Chaim Benzion Schwarz
Represented By: Anne Pellegrom Daher
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Axel
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Karen Barbara Musalo
Represented By: John Edward Willshire
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition
Represented By: Zachary Abraham Albun
Represented By: Steven Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Brian C Earl
Represented By: Jamie Lorraine Crook
Represented By: Blaine Meredith Bookey
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Represented By: Chaim Benzion Schwarz
Represented By: Anne Pellegrom Daher
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Axel
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Karen Barbara Musalo
Represented By: John Edward Willshire
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Street Community Services, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Abraham Albun
Represented By: Steven Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Brian C Earl
Represented By: Jamie Lorraine Crook
Represented By: Blaine Meredith Bookey
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Represented By: Chaim Benzion Schwarz
Represented By: Anne Pellegrom Daher
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Axel
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Karen Barbara Musalo
Represented By: John Edward Willshire
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pangea Legal Services
Represented By: Zachary Abraham Albun
Represented By: Steven Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Brian C Earl
Represented By: Jamie Lorraine Crook
Represented By: Blaine Meredith Bookey
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Represented By: Chaim Benzion Schwarz
Represented By: Anne Pellegrom Daher
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Axel
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Karen Barbara Musalo
Represented By: John Edward Willshire
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony H. Pham
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Morgan
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: August Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals
Represented By: Michael James Stortz
Represented By: Steven H Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kids in Need of Defense
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Represented By: Ellen Scordino
Represented By: Danielle Therease Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Law Professors
Represented By: Peter Simon Margulies
Represented By: Shoba Wadhia
Represented By: Neil Gerard Nandi
Represented By: Laura K. McNally
Represented By: Camron Dowlatshahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Represented By: Ellen Scordino
Represented By: Danielle Therease Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: Marissa Suzanne Malouff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Counsel
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Former Immigration Judges
Represented By: Michael James Stortz
Represented By: Steven H Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Immigration Equality
Represented By: Austin W Manes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?