Lawrence et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jane Lawrence and Dr. James Lawrence
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv09291
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:20-cv-01341. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 22, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; District of Delaware, 1:20-cv-01341-RGA Lawrence, et al. v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-09291-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 248 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-248). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 12/16/2020. (nms)
December 17, 2020 Case transferred to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (nms)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lawrence, Jane Lawrence. Monsanto Company served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020. (Bifferato, Ian)
October 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $400, receipt number BDEDC-3241004.) - filed by James Lawrence, Jane Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)
October 2, 2020 No Summons Issued. (kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Lawrence
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. James Lawrence
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Eric G. Lasker
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?