In re: DMCA Subpoena to Cloudfare, Inc.
Petitioner: CSJJ Media, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020mc80179
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Subpoena Issued to produce documents, information, or objects or to permit inspection of premises in a civil action re #1 . (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Petition (Miscellaneous Case Opening), by CSJJ Media, Inc.. (Suzuki, Junji) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 Declaration of Junji Suzuki in Support of Request for DMCA Subpoena to CloudFare, Inc. (Filing fee $47, receipt 34611151168). Filed by CSJJ Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoena)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2020: #2 Receipt) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: DMCA Subpoena to Cloudfare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CSJJ Media, Inc.
Represented By: Junji Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?