Wirjadi v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Andy Wirjadi
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00018
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andy Wirjadi (Bray, Joseph) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andy Wirjadi.. (Bray, Joseph) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andy Wirjadi.. (Bray, Joseph) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judg e filed by Andy Wirjadi Form is incomplete. Defendant field needs to be completed. Please.pdf the document before filing. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bray, Joseph) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For refund of Penalty against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15394425.). Filed byAndy Wirjadi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bray, Joseph) (Filed on 1/4/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wirjadi v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Wirjadi
Represented By: Joseph Michael Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?