Hampel et al v. First Republic Bank
Plaintiff: Amit M. Hampel and Stacy S. Hampel
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Case Number: 3:2021cv00068
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, March 25, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.< /p< (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 2/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First Republic Bank.. (Speyer, James) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Frederic Speyer on behalf of Defendant First Republic Bank (Speyer, James) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Class Action) for Damages byFirst Republic Bank. (Speyer, James) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amit M. Hampel, Stacy S. Hampel.. (Pettis, James) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amit M. Hampel, Stacy S. Hampel re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Proposed Summons, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Complaint, (Pettis, James) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to First Republic Bank. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Pettis, James) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/20/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amit M. Hampel, Stacy S. Hampel re #1 Complaint, (Pettis, James) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Republic Bank ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15405155.). Filed byStacy S. Hampel, Amit M. Hampel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pettis, James) (Filed on 1/6/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampel et al v. First Republic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amit M. Hampel
Represented By: James C. Pettis
Represented By: Sarah Beth Burwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy S. Hampel
Represented By: James C. Pettis
Represented By: Sarah Beth Burwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Represented By: James Frederic Speyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?