Hess v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Desdnie Hess
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation and United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00093
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 3/17/2021. Replies due by 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/15/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROTOCOL FOR INTERVIEWING PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Parcel Service, Inc... (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO L.R. 6-1 AND 6-2 filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH SUPERIOR COURT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4 /5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Corrected). (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Rose for Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20 re: #1 . 4 Notice of Removal, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/20/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service of America, Inc., Corporate Parent UPS Worldwide Forwarding, Inc., Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware) for United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20078425, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15408273). Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Certificate/Proof of Service, #(4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/6/2021) Modified on 1/7/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hess v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desdnie Hess
Represented By: Kristabel Sandoval
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: Kyle G. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Joseph Richard Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?