Post et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: John Mechas and Bonnie Post
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00179
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-02866. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 8, 2021 Cases associated: Create association to 3:16-md-02741-VC. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Middle District of Florida (Tampa), 8:20-cv-02866-VMC-CPT, Post et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-00179-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 249 cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741. (JNB)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/16/2020. (TWL)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 12/9/2020 by Bonnie Post, John Mechas as to Monsanto Company. (Grinder, Austin)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (CRH)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-2866-T-33CPT. (SJB)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17624905) filed by Bonnie Post, John Mechas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Grinder, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mechas
Represented By: Austin Johnson Grinder
Represented By: Eric Daniel Roslansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Post
Represented By: Austin Johnson Grinder
Represented By: Eric Daniel Roslansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Eric G. Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?