Wheeler v. Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Wheeler and Jacob Wheeler
Defendant: Steve R. Carchedi, David C. Stump, Steven B. Ketchum, Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., James W. Young, Homer Pearce, H. Ward Wolff, Nicole Onetto and Homer L. Pearce
Case Number: 3:2021cv00511
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jacob Wheeler (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Wheeler.. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/25/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
January 22, 2021 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded to enter party's name correctly - John Wheeler has been corrected to JACOB Wheeler. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Jacob Wheeler. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Steve R. Carchedi, Steven B. Ketchum, Nicole Onetto, Homer L. Pearce, David C. Stump, Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Ward Wolff, James W. Young. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS LIST OF DEFENDANTS)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by John Wheeler (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/4/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15472842.). Filed byJohn Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 1/21/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve R. Carchedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Ketchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ward Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Onetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer L. Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wheeler
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Wheeler
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?