Brekke et al v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jordone Shane-Sanchez, Omar Galrland, Casey McKay and Amanda Brekke
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2021cv00751
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 20 Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/22/21. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 18 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances:< /b< Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, April 22, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. p< (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Knopp, Gregory) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amanda Brekke, Omar Galrland, Casey McKay, Jordone Shane-Sanchez.. (Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE and Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court by Starbucks Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Notice to Adverse Party and the Superior Court of Removal of Action and Proof of Service))(Knopp, Gregory) (Filed on 2/9/2021) Modified on 2/10/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #11 Alan L. Quiles's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15546661.) filed by Amanda Brekke. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Quiles, Alan) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE to Parties and Counsel of Court's Order Setting Initial CMC and ADR Deadlines, Notice of Case Assignment, and Supplemental Materials Pursuant to L.R. 4-2 by Starbucks Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Case Assignment, #3 Exhibit C-Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Ryu, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order, #5 Exhibit E-Notice re Telephonic Appearance Procedures, #6 Exhibit F-Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California, #7 Exhibit G-Brochure-Consenting to a Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction, #8 Exhibit H-Magistrate Judge Consent-Declination form)(Knopp, Gregory) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/8/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Camar R. Jones' Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #6 Gregg I. Shavitz's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Camar Jones ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15534933.) filed by Amanda Brekke. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Camar) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Gregg I. Shavitz ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15534891.) filed by Amanda Brekke. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/28/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/16/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Starbucks Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Knopp, Gregory) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Starbucks Corporation . (Knopp, Gregory) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Pursuant to 28 USC 1332(d)(2), 1441, 1446, and 1453 from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV2003380. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15511995). Filed byStarbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory W. Knopp in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint) to Declaration of Gregory W. Knopp, #3 Exhibit B (Documents served with Summons and Complaint) to Declaration of Gregory W. Knopp, #4 Exhibit C (Starbucks Answer and Civil Case Cover Sheet) to Declaration of Gregory W. Knopp, #5 Declaration of Charlotte Fenner in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Action, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service of Notice of Removal and Supporting Documents)(Knopp, Gregory) (Filed on 1/29/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brekke et al v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordone Shane-Sanchez
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles,
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Galrland
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles,
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey McKay
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles,
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Brekke
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Camar Ricardo Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Gregory William Knopp
Represented By: Jonathan Peter Slowik
Represented By: Laura Lillian Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?