Negron v. White et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Negron
Defendant: V. White and M. Lotersztain
Case Number: 3:2021cv01070
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 Mail sent to Miguel Angel Negron returned as undeliverable re #5 Order. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
February 18, 2021 Transferring case electronically to the Eastern of California. ***2:21-cv-00322*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 17, 2021 Copy of #4 Clerk's Notice re IFP mailed to plaintiff. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/22/2021. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Miguel Angel Negron.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Miguel Angel Negron. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under the Prisoner Civil Rights Act against M. Lotersztain, V. White (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Miguel Angel Negron. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negron v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lotersztain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?