Williams v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Ellen Williams
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv01073
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/21/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ellen Williams.. (Kim, Brian) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Brian) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (ERISA) against Unum Life Insurance Company of America, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15566955). Filed by Ellen Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Kim, Brian) (Filed on 2/11/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert Edward Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Williams
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?