Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. de la Vega et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. and Turtle Island Restoration Network
Defendant: Scott de la Vega and Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 3:2021cv01182
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fish and Wildlife Service, Scott de la Vega.. (Mayhall, Taylor) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 3/10/2021; Scott de la Vega served on 3/11/2021; U.S. Attorney served on 3/17/2021; U.S. Attorney General served on 3/2/2021. Answer due 5/17/2021. (Sakashita, Miyoko) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Anne Mayhall (Mayhall, Taylor) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network.. (Venkatakrishnan, Lalli) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Fish and Wildlife Service, Scott de la Vega, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network . (Sakashita, Miyoko) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network (Certificate of Interested Parties & Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Sakashita, Miyoko) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sakashita, Miyoko) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fish and Wildlife Service, Scott de la Vega ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15589761.). Filed byCenter for Biological Diversity, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Scott de la Vega), #3 Summons (U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service), #4 Summons (U.S. Attorney), #5 Summons (Attorney General))(Sakashita, Miyoko) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used re: #1 .[err101]. The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The c orrect event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file the proposed summons using the instructions above. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20). Please complete correct Civil Cover Shee t and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. de la Vega et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc.
Represented By: Miyoko Sakashita
Represented By: Lalli Venkatakrishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turtle Island Restoration Network
Represented By: Miyoko Sakashita
Represented By: Lalli Venkatakrishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott de la Vega
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?