Boone Jr. et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: EMMETT BOONE JR, NEL BOONE and Emmett Boone, Jr.
Defendant: FCA US LLC, HILLTOP CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE RAM and Hilltop Chrylser Jeep Dodge Ram
Case Number: 3:2021cv01591
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JUDGMENT AND ORDER RE ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/14/2023. ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2023)
April 7, 2023 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FEES COSTS AND EXPENSES and REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER filed by Emmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone and FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 4/7/2023) Modified on 4/10/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Request for Entry of Judgment filed by Emmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone. Responses due by 4/19/2023. Replies due by 4/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 4/5/2023)
April 4, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Motions - General > Judgment on the Pleadings. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #33 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by Emmett Boone, Jr., Nel Boone (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
April 4, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Emmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE DECEDENT PLAINTIFF'S SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/1/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFFS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, NEL BOONE, IN PLACE OF DECEASED PLAINTIFF EMMETT BOONE JR filed by Emmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone and FCAUSLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Rabieian, Debora) (Filed on 11/30/2022) Modified on 11/30/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Debora Rabieian (Rabieian, Debora) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/7/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/3/2023. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/20/2023. Designation of Experts due by 3/6/2023. Dispositive Motion due by 5/22/2023. Rebuttal Reports due by 3/20/2023. Jury Selection set for 10/2/2023 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/28/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines filed by Emmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone and FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 10/25/2022) Modified on 10/26/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/28/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE REMAND. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/16/2021. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/10/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/10/2021)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The motion to remand, Dkt. No. #17 , is suitable for decision without oral argument. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The motion hearing on June 10, 2021, is vacated. The initial case management conference will be held as scheduled by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by June 9, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/8/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Emmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone . (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 6/3/2021) Modified on 6/4/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2021 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 16-9 filed by Emmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 6/3/2021) Modified on 6/4/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Remand ) filed byEmmett Boone, Jr. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #17 MOTION to Remand filed byEmmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand filed by Emmett Boone, Jr, Nel Boone. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/17/2021. Replies due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC, Corporate Parent FCA HOLDCO B.V., Corporate Parent STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.) for FCA US LLC. Amended (Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 4/6/2021) Modified on 4/7/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/11/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #12 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, (Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2021 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded NOT to enter parties' names in capitalized letters. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re : #1 Notice of Removal, filed by FCA US LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Azemoon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Trina Marie Clayton (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Pollard Vilchez (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Other Affiliate FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate FCA HOLDCO B.V., Other Affiliate STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.) for FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by FCA US LLC . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is CIVMS20-02593. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15662840). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine Vilchez iso Ntc of Removal, #2 *** Copy of Complaint attached *** - Exhibit A to KPV Decl iso Removal, #3 Exhibit B to KPV Decl iso Removal, #4 Exhibit C to KPV Decl iso Removal, #5 Exhibit D to KPV Decl iso Removal, #6 Exhibit E to KPV Decl iso Removal, #7 Exhibit F to KPV Decl iso Removal, #8 Exhibit G to KPV Decl iso Removal, #9 Exhibit H to KPV Decl iso Removal, #10 Exhibit I to KPV Decl iso Removal, #11 Exhibit J to KPV Decl iso Removal, #12 Exhibit K to KPV Decl iso Removal, #13 Exhibit L to KPV Decl iso Removal, #14 Exhibit M to KPV Decl iso Removal, #15 Exhibit N to KPV Decl iso Removal, #16 Exhibit O to KPV Decl iso Removal, #17 Exhibit P to KPV Decl iso Removal, #18 Exhibit Q to KPV Decl iso Removal, #19 Exhibit R to KPV Decl iso Removal, #20 Exhibit S to KPV Decl iso Removal, #21 Exhibit T to KPV Decl iso Removal, #22 Exhibit U to KPV Decl iso Removal, #23 Exhibit V to KPV Decl iso Removal, #24 Exhibit W to KPV Decl iso Removal, #25 Exhibit X to KPV Decl iso Removal, #26 Exhibit Y to KPV Decl iso Removal, #27 Exhibit Z to KPV Decl iso Removal, #28 Exhibit AA to KPV Decl iso Removal, #29 Exhibit BB to KPV Decl iso Removal, #30 Exhibit CC to KPV Decl iso Removal, #31 Exhibit DD to KPV Decl iso Removal, #32 Exhibit EE to KPV Decl iso Removal, #33 Exhibit FF to KPV Decl iso Removal, #34 Exhibit GG to KPV Decl iso Removal, #35 Exhibit HH to KPV Decl iso Removal, #36 Exhibit II to KPV Decl iso Removal, #37 Exhibit JJ to KPV Decl iso Removal, #38 Exhibit KK to KPV Decl iso Removal, #39 Exhibit LL to KPV Decl iso Removal, #40 Exhibit MM to KPV Decl iso Removal, #41 Exhibit NN to KPV Decl iso Removal, #42 Exhibit OO to KPV Decl iso Removal, #43 Exhibit PP to KPV Decl iso Removal, #44 Exhibit QQ to KPV Decl iso Removal, #45 Exhibit RR to KPV Decl iso Removal, #46 Exhibit SS to KPV Decl iso Removal, #47 Exhibit TT to KPV Decl iso Removal, #48 Exhibit UU to KPV Decl iso Removal, #49 Exhibit VV to KPV Decl iso Removal, #50 Exhibit WW to KPV Decl iso Removal, #51 Exhibit XX to KPV Decl iso Removal, #52 Exhibit YY to KPV Decl iso Removal, #53 Exhibit ZZ to KPV Decl iso Removal, #54 Exhibit AAA to KPV Decl iso Removal, #55 Exhibit BBB to KPV Decl iso Removal, #56 Exhibit CCC to KPV Decl iso Removal, #57 Exhibit DDD to KPV Decl iso Removal, #58 Exhibit EEE to KPV Decl iso Removal, #59 Exhibit FFF to KPV Decl iso Removal, #60 Exhibit GGG to KPV Decl iso Removal, #61 Exhibit HHH to KPV Decl iso Removal, #62 Exhibit III to KPV Decl iso Removal, #63 Exhibit JJJ to KPV Decl iso Removal, #64 Exhibit KKK to KPV Decl iso Removal, #65 Exhibit LLL to KPV Decl iso Removal, #66 Exhibit MMM to KPV Decl iso Removal, #67 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2021) Modified on 3/8/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone Jr. et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMETT BOONE JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEL BOONE
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Debora Rabieian
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Boone, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Debora Rabieian
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Trina Marie Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLTOP CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE RAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilltop Chrylser Jeep Dodge Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?