Lee v. Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Patricia Lee
Defendant: Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01597
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/15/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monterey Financial Services, LLC (Poole, Jeff) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byMonterey Financial Services, LLC. (Poole, Jeff) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Monterey Financial Services, LLC.. (Poole, Jeff) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2021 01:30 PM. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/22/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of State Court Action from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CSM-21-864009. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0971-15664697). Filed by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Poole, Jeff) (Filed on 3/5/2021) Modified on 3/8/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeff Wiley Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?