Gor v. British Airways, PLC
Plaintiff: Anita Gor
Defendant: British Airways, PLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01840
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 04/16/2021. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 4/16/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by British Airways, PLC. Amendment to #15 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge . (Nowinski, Ivy) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by British Airways, PLC.. (Nowinski, Ivy) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15837523.) filed by British Airways, PLC. (Battista, Anthony) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/21/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by British Airways, PLC identifying Corporate Parent International Consolidated Airlines Group, S.A. for British Airways, PLC. (Nowinski, Ivy) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by British Airways, PLC identifying Corporate Parent International Consolidated Airlines Group, S.A. for British Airways, PLC. (Nowinski, Ivy) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses byBritish Airways, PLC. (Cunningham, Scott) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anita Gor re #7 Summons Issued March 17, 2021 (Cienfuegos, P.) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to British Airways, PLC. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Anita Gor . (Cienfuegos, P.) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Cienfuegos, P.) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Anita Gor . (Cienfuegos, P.) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff Anita Gor against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15707212.). Filed byAnita Gor. (Cienfuegos, P.) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version that can be downloaded from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Anita Gor (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gor v. British Airways, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Gor
Represented By: P. David Cienfuegos
Represented By: Mona Deldar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways, PLC
Represented By: Scott David Cunningham
Represented By: Ivy Larsen Nowinski
Represented By: Anthony U Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?