In the Matter of the Tax Liabilities of John Does
Petitioner: United States of America
In Re: In the Matter of the Tax Liabilities of John Does
Case Number: 3:2021cv02201
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #1 Petition, as narrowed by #8 Response. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 5, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO #6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit B)(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why #1 Petition should not be denied. Response due by April 14, 2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 31, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/13/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by In the Matter of the Tax Liabilities of John Does re #1 Petition, of Filing Ex Parte Petition for Leave to Serve "John Doe" Summons (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 Brief re #1 Petition, Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Petition for Leave to Serve "John Doe" Summons filed byIn the Matter of the Tax Liabilities of John Does. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Leave to Serve "John Doe" Summons against All Parties (). Filed by Department of Justice . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Karen Cincotta, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order)(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 3/30/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Tax Liabilities of John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In the Matter of the Tax Liabilities of John Does
Represented By: Amy Talburt Matchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Amy Talburt Matchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?