JACKSON v. ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation et al
Plaintiff: O'SHEA JACKSON, SR and ICE CUBE
Defendant: ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, and ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv02304
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion and Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To FRCP 12(b) ) filed byROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, /Notice of Motion and Motion To Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 Et. Seq. ) filed byROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Perso ns granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry. ) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion and Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To FRCP 12(b) ) OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed byO'SHEA JACKSON, SR. (Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, /Notice of Motion and Motion To Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 Et. Seq. ) OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 ET SEQ. filed byO'SHEA JACKSON, SR. (Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
April 27, 2021 Received one DVD re #13 Request for Judicial Notice. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 Declaration of Joseph Burgess in Support of #11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, /Notice of Motion and Motion To Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 Et. Seq. (Corrected Declaration of Joseph Burgess) filed byROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motions Hearing #11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, /Notice of Motion and Motion To Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 Et. Seq. and #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion and Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To FRCP 12(b) set for 6/3/2021 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Briefing schedule remains the same. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb G eneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document as sociated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew J. McKissick representing Defendants. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15876284.) filed by ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McKissick, Matthew) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation identifying Corporate Parent ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation, Other Affiliate Index Ventures, Other Affiliate Baiju Bhatt, Other Affiliate Vladimir Tenev for ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,; Other Affiliate Index Ventures, Other Affiliate Baiju Bhatt, Other Affiliate Vladimir Tenev for ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation.. (Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation re #13 Request for Judicial Notice,, (Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion and Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To FRCP 12(b), #11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, /Notice of Motion and Motion To Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 Et. Seq. filed byROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DVD)(Related document(s) #12 , #11 ) (Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion and Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To FRCP 12(b) filed by ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 5/6/2021. Replies due by 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, /Notice of Motion and Motion To Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 Et. Seq. filed by ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 5/6/2021. Replies due by 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Burgess In Support of Defendants' Motion To Strike Pursuant To California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 ET. SEQ., #2 Proposed Order)(Langberg, Mitchell) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by O'SHEA JACKSON, SR re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint serving Robinhood Financial, LLC (Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by O'SHEA JACKSON, SR re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued Proof of Service of Summons and Compliant serving Robinhood Markets, Inc. (Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by O'SHEA JACKSON, SR.. (Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, and ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/14/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by O'SHEA JACKSON, SR . (Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15776653.). Filed byO'SHEA JACKSON, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Taitelman, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 REMINDER to Counsel - submit missing documents: Counsel is reminded to docket the AO120 form- Report on Filing of Action Regarding Patent or Trademark using ECF event Patent/Trademark Report. The form can be found on our civil forms webpage. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'SHEA JACKSON, SR
Represented By: Michael Andrew Taitelman
Represented By: Sean Michael Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICE CUBE
Represented By: Michael Andrew Taitelman
Represented By: Sean Michael Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,
Represented By: Matthew J. McKissick
Represented By: Mitchell Joel Langberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. McKissick
Represented By: Mitchell Joel Langberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?