Johnson v. REG8 Sequoia Station, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Franklin Street Caffe,
3Rd Party Plaintiff: REG8 Sequoia Station, LLC,
Case Number: 3:2021cv02395
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Scott Johnson for settlement and Request to vacate all currently set dates (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by REG8 Sequoia Station, LLC,.. (Park, Ernie) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by REG8 Sequoia Station, LLC, (Park, Ernie) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/18/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 CROSSCLAIM against Franklin Street Caffe,. Filed byREG8 Sequoia Station, LLC,. (Park, Ernie) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Franklin Street Caffe, byREG8 Sequoia Station, LLC,. (Park, Ernie) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Franklin Street Caffe, served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. REG8 Sequoia Station, LLC, served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Franklin Street Caffe,, REG8 Sequoia Station, LLC,. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/16/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15785699.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/2/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. REG8 Sequoia Station, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Prathima Reddy Price
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Street Caffe,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: REG8 Sequoia Station, LLC,
Represented By: Ernie Zachary Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?