Impossible Foods Inc. v. Impossible X LLC
Plaintiff: Impossible Foods Inc.
Defendant: Impossible X LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv02419
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Impossible Foods Inc.. Service waived by Impossible X LLC waiver sent on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Impossible X LLC. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Impossible Foods Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Patrick O. Brown for Impossible Foods Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Impossible X LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15790039.). Filed byImpossible Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 4/2/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impossible Foods Inc. v. Impossible X LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impossible X LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impossible Foods Inc.
Represented By: John Lawrence Slafsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?