Flier et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: PATRICIA FLIER and RICHARD FLIER
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv02553
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #68 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023)
March 13, 2023 Filing 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS) FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 3/13/2023)
March 13, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE by FCA US LLC Notice of Disassociation of Counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC as to Sharon L. Stewart (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 3/13/2023)
March 3, 2023 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES HEARING set for May 19, 2023 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 23, 2023 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2023)
February 27, 2023 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING Motion for Attorney Fees hearing set for April 14, 2023 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 16, 2023 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 27, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 23, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/9/2023. Replies due by 3/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Supplement, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order)(Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 16, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Zavig Mkrdech on behalf of Plaintiffs (Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 62 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/9/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 8, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 68(a) filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 2/8/2023) Modified on 2/8/2023 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #61 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entr y of Judgment filed by Richard Flier, Patricia Flier, PATRICIA FLIER (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
December 29, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin J Scott of Counsel (Scott, Caitlin) (Filed on 12/29/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #47 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin J Scott (Scott, Caitlin) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jeffrey Pardo (Pardo, Matthew) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine J Haw (Haw, Christine) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 55 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Third Updated filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE by FCA US LLC Notice of Disassociation of Counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC as to Sharon L. Stewart (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing set for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 15, 2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022) Modified on 10/20/2022 (ls, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2022 Set/Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 18, 2022 Filing 52 REPLY (re #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #50 Stipulation. 1. Close of Fact Discovery as to the deposition of Patricia Flier only by December 1, 2022; 2. Last day to serve Initial Expert report by December 29, 2022; 3. Last day to serve Rebuttal Expert report by January 18, 2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 14, 2022 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Scheduling Order filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 49 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byPatricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
September 28, 2022 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings hearing set for October 28, 2022 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing reset for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. The Case Management Conference set for October 28, 2022 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/11/2022. Replies due by 10/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 26, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Azemoon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 26, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg Gruzman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 26, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 26, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Marie Rogerson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #40 Stipulation. 1. Close of Fact Discovery by 10/24/2022; 2. Last day to serve Initial Expert report by 11/7/2022; 3. Last day to serve Rebuttal Expert report by 11/21/22; 4. Motions deadline of 2/9/2023; 5. Close of Expert Discovery by 3/10/2023; 6. Joint Case Management Statement by 10/21/2022; 7. Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE by FCA US LLC Notice of Disassociation of counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC (Sharon L. Stewart) (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND SCHEDULE filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 12, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Scott S. Shepardson (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 7/12/2022)
June 20, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/20/2022)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #32 Motion for Protective Order. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2022)
May 26, 2022 Filing 36 Statement of Non-Opposition re #32 Proposed MOTION for Protective Order filed byFCA US LLC. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 5/26/2022)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: The Case Management Conference set for June 3, 2022 is vacated. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2022. Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/22/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/10/2022. Motions due by 9/5/2022. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/24/2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 23, 2022 Filing 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING Proposed MOTION for Protective Order hearing set for June 3, 2022 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the co urt as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 12, 2022 at 9:00 AM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. B reyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #32 Proposed MOTION for Protective Order . Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 13, 2022 Filing 32 Proposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/27/2022. Replies due by 6/3/2022. (Tirmizi, Rabiya) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 18, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Rabiya F. Tirmizi (Tirmizi, Rabiya) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on February 11, 2022 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 3, 2022 Filing 28 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 3, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs Richard Flier and Patricia Flier's Request for Remote Appearance at the Case Management Conference on February 11, 2022)(Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 2, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
January 29, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Grace Dolin (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/29/2022)
December 7, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Kuemerle (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 12/7/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaleceia VaShayla White (White, Jaleceia) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Case referred to Private Mediation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/5/2021. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #13 Motion to Remand. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION to Remand hearing set for September 30, 2021 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. The motion will be determined on the briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier identifying Other Affiliate PATRICIA FLIER for Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION to Remand hearing set for October 1, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in t he argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 27, 2021 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Remand ) filed byPatricia Flier, Richard Flier. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott S. Shepardson)(Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO REMAND set for August 27, 2021 AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE set for October 1, 2021. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand filed by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/30/2021. Replies due by 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patricia Flier, Richard Flier.. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2021. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) Modified on 5/11/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is 34-2020-00282966-CU-BC-GDS. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15812309). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Declaration of Scott S. Shepardson, #4 Declaration of Sharon L. Stewart, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit AA, #32 Exhibit BB, #33 Exhibit CC, #34 Exhibit DD, #35 Exhibit EE, #36 Exhibit FF, #37 Exhibit GG, #38 Exhibit HH, #39 Exhibit II, #40 Exhibit JJ, #41 Exhibit KK, #42 Exhibit LL, #43 Exhibit MM, #44 Exhibit NN, #45 Exhibit OO, #46 Exhibit PP, #47 Exhibit QQ, #48 Exhibit RR)(Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 4/8/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flier et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA FLIER
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Jaleceia VaShayla White
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Caitlin J Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD FLIER
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Jaleceia VaShayla White
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Caitlin J Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Scott S. Shepardson
Represented By: Sharon Lynn Stewart
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?