San Francisco Baykeeper v. United States Fish And Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Deb Haaland and Martha Williams
Petitioner: Westlands Water District
Case Number: 3:2021cv02566
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDeb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams. (Mayhall, Taylor) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING HEARINGS AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Mgmt Conference Statement due 7/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference re-set for 7/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Intervene re-set for 7/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. These proceedings will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons grante d access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ( klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Oppostion (re #13 MOTION to Intervene) filed by Westlands Water District. (Ginsberg, Beth) (Filed on 5/26/2021) Modified on 5/26/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order. Signed 5/21/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - David Filippi.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David E. Filippi ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15992473.) filed by Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mills, Michael) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byDeb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayhall, Taylor) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Intervene ) filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Intervene)(Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order. Signed 5/17/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Beth Ginsberg.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Westlands Water District.. (Mills, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 5/28/2021. Replies due by 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Preston Heard, #3 Exhibit Datestamped Notice of Intent to Sue Letter to Acting Secretary of the Interior)(Mayhall, Taylor) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Beth S. Ginsberg ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15930611.) filed by Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mills, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene filed by Westlands Water District. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 5/19/2021. Replies due by 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Beth S. Ginsberg, #2 Declaration of Jose Gutierrez, #3 Proposed Answer, #4 Proposed Order)(Mills, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams.. (Mayhall, Taylor) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Baykeeper.. (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Anne Mayhall (Mayhall, Taylor) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Francisco Baykeeper (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Francisco Baykeeper (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by San Francisco Baykeeper Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Deb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15814022.). Filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 4/8/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. United States Fish And Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Brian Bamford Flynn
Represented By: Michael Robert Lozeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Michael Nathan Mills
Represented By: Beth S Ginsberg
Represented By: David E. Filippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?