Bryant et al v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Bryant and Kerry Bryant
Defendant: Timothy Taylor and Lynda Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv02610
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: ESTABLISHMENT OF LEADER REMEDIATION TRUST AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 11, 2021. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE ESTABLISHMENT OF LEADER REMEDIATION TRUST AND DISMISSAL filed by Kerry Bryant, Nancy Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Stone, Bret) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Telephone Conference held on 5/6/2021.Total Time in Court: 14 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Melanie Marotti. Defendant Attorney: David Wood. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE - MAY 6, 2021 AT 2:00 PM. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 1047951The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Telephone Conference set for 5/6/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Kerry Bryant, Nancy Bryant re #12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE ESTABLISHMENT OF LEADER REMEDIATION TRUST AND DISMISSAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement)(Stone, Bret) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 29, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file the document using the correct event "Certificate of Interested Entities" under the Other Filings/Notices category. E-filer is also reminded NOT to use the form from another district. Re:[11-1] Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Lynda Smith, Timothy Taylor. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE ESTABLISHMENT OF LEADER REMEDIATION TRUST AND DISMISSAL filed by Kerry Bryant, Nancy Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A to the Proposed Order)(Stone, Bret) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint filed byLynda Smith, Timothy Taylor. (Attachments: #1 * ERRONEOUS ENTRY * Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties)(Wood, David) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/22/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 4/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE Re: Docket No. #3 : The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lynda Smith, Timothy Taylor. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Kerry Bryant, Nancy Bryant Re: #1 Complaint. (Stone, Bret) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. Please use October 2020 version which can be downloaded from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made u ntil the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Nancy Bryant, Kerry Bryant (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE ESTABLISHMENT OF LEADER REMEDIATION TRUST AND DISMISSAL filed by Kerry Bryant, Nancy Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Bret) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stone, Bret) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lynda Smith, Timothy Taylor ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15820273.). Filed byKerry Bryant, Nancy Bryant. (Stone, Bret) (Filed on 4/9/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Taylor
Represented By: David Ferguson Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Smith
Represented By: David Ferguson Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Bryant
Represented By: Bret Adam Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Bryant
Represented By: Bret Adam Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?