Wilkinson et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nancy Urbanczyk, Laura Perkinson and Kathleen Wilkinson
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv02777
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Liu (Liu, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy William Loose (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES filed by Facebook, Inc. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Chorba (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Laura Perkinson, Nancy Urbanczyk, Kathleen Wilkinson (Logan, Todd) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Dayanim.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Behnam Dayanim ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15991974.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Dayanim, Behnam) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andy M. LeGolvan (LeGolvan, Andy) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean David Unger (Unger, Sean) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2021, 02:00 PM, in San Francisco, - To be determined. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, July 8, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/z oom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Laura Perkinson, Nancy Urbanczyk, Kathleen Wilkinson.. (Logan, Todd) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Logan, Todd) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Todd M. Logan (Logan, Todd) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Please update your ECF profiles to reflect your address change. Re: #3 Notice of Change of Address filed by Nancy Urbanczyk, Kathleen Wilkinson, L aura Perkinson (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15851294). Filed by Kathleen Wilkinson, Laura Perkinson, Nancy Urbanczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Willa Moore, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jan Saari, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Laura Perkinson, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Donna Reed, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Aida Glover, #6 Exhibit 6 - (iPad Lodged with Court), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Logan, Todd) (Filed on 4/16/2021) Modified on 4/19/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkinson et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Urbanczyk
Represented By: Todd M. Logan
Represented By: Brandt Silver-Korn
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Perkinson
Represented By: Todd M. Logan
Represented By: Brandt Silver-Korn
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wilkinson
Represented By: Todd M. Logan
Represented By: Brandt Silver-Korn
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Andy M. LeGolvan
Represented By: Christopher Chorba
Represented By: Timothy William Loose
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Adrienne Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?