Wang et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yixin Wang and Joseph McCarthy
Defendant: Fremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv02820
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE by Joseph McCarthy, Yixin Wang of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 37 Certified copy of docket sheet and remand order mailed to Alameda County Superior Court. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Seeborg granting #14 Motion to Remand. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
January 29, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Grace Dolin (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/29/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/3/2022 is continued to 3/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 33 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [Proposed] Order filed by Joseph McCarthy, Yixin Wang. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 6, 2022 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2022. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/13/2022 is continued to 2/3/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. All parties shall attend by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
December 15, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by Joseph McCarthy, Yixin Wang of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
December 7, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Kuemerle (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 12/7/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/9/21 is continued to 1/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Stuhlbarg, Richard) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 26 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 25 Supplemental Brief re #20 Order filed byFCA US LLC. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Stuhlbarg, Richard) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 27, 2021 Filing 24 Supplemental Brief re #20 Order filed byJoseph McCarthy, Yixin Wang. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 24, 2021 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE MOTION [#14] TO REMAND SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON OCTOBER 28, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/23/2021 is continued to 12/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. All parties shall attend by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan A. Reynolds (Reynolds, Bryan) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing previously set for 8/26/2021 is continued to 10/28/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at RScrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 24, 2021 at 12:00 pm.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no docum ent associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY in support of (re #14 MOTION to Remand) filed by Joseph McCarthy, Yixin Wang. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 8/11/2021) Modified on 8/12/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Lotardo (Lotardo, Regina) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFCA US LLC, Fremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monica Y. Hernandez in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hernandez, Monica) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for July 22, 2021 is continued to September 23, 2021 at 10:00 AM. All parties shall attend by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. Joint Case Management Statement due by September 16, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand filed by Joseph McCarthy, Yixin Wang. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/4/2021. Replies due by 8/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of c ounsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at RScrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 21, 2021 at 12:00 PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joseph McCarthy, Yixin Wang (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joseph McCarthy, Yixin Wang. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2021. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 05/04/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Hernandez, Monica) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/4/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 19, 2021 Answer to Removed Complaint (see document #1 -6) filed by FCA US LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Answer to Removed Complaint (see document #1 -7) filed by Fremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC, Fremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent FCA Holdco B.V., Corporate Parent Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.) for FCA US LLC; Corporate Parent DGDG Automotive, LLC, Corporate Parent DGDG Subco, LLC, Corporate Parent DGDG HoldCo, LLC for Fremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (Bokmuller, Tammara) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by FCA US LLC, Fremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram . (Bokmuller, Tammara) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG21092047. (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15857669). Filed by Fremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tammara N. Bokmuller In Support of FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Bokmuller, Tammara) (Filed on 4/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Represented By: Tammara Nicole Bokmuller
Represented By: Monica Yee Hernandez
Represented By: Richard Louis Stuhlbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Tammara Nicole Bokmuller
Represented By: Monica Yee Hernandez
Represented By: Richard Louis Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Bryan A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yixin Wang
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McCarthy
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?