King v. Alameda County Department of Child Support Services
Plaintiff: Troy King
Defendant: Alameda County Department of Child Support Services
Case Number: 3:2021cv02839
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/16/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alameda County Department of Child Support Services.. (MacKay, Raymond) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byAlameda County Department of Child Support Services. (Related document(s) #9 ) (MacKay, Raymond) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Alameda County Department of Child Support Services. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 6/23/2021. Replies due by 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raymond L. MacKay, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(MacKay, Raymond) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy King. Alameda County Department of Child Support Services served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT By U.S. Marshal as to #5 Summons Issued. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/25/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alameda County Department of Child Support Services. (Attachments: #1 USM 285, #2 USM 285)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #2 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Troy King. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alameda County Department of Child Support Services. Filed byTroy King. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Alameda County Department of Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Department of Child Support Services
Represented By: Raymond L. MacKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?