Rutledge v. Monsanto et al
Plaintiff: Donald Rutledge
Defendant: Monsanto, Nouryan Surface Chemicals, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC and Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03164
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 25 Declaration of Adam Jones in Support of #24 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand Rutledge Case filed byMonsanto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #24 ) (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMonsanto. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nouryan Surface Chemicals identifying Other Affiliate Carlyle Group, Other Affiliate GIC for Nouryan Surface Chemicals. [Plaintiff Donald Rutledge] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC identifying Other Affiliate Carlyle Group, Other Affiliate GIC for Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC. [Plaintiff Donald Rutledge] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nouryan Chemicals LLC identifying Other Affiliate Carlyle Group, Other Affiliate GIC for Nouryan Chemicals LLC. [Plaintiff Donald Rutledge] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Akzo Nobel Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate Akzo Nobel N.V. for Akzo Nobel Incorporated. [Plaintiff Donald Rutledge] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand filed by Donald Rutledge. Responses due by 5/28/2021. Replies due by 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Cooney, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01909. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 29, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Northern District of Illinois (Chicago), 1:21-cv-1909, Rutledge v. Monsanto et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-03164-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 266 cc: JPMDL (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2021 Filing 17 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Northern District of California the electronic record. Mailed letter to all counsel of record. (jn, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC Northern District of California on 4/26/2021. Mailed notice. (jn, )
April 26, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2741 Conditional Transfer Order filed 4/26/2021. (jn, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Donald Rutledge to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cooney, Michael)
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Donald Rutledge by Michael Conor Cooney (Cooney, Michael)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC to dismiss Surfactant Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Mendoza, Riley)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to counsel of record. (jn, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 5/12/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto(Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Monsanto, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals by Peter Francis O'Neill (O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Akzo Nobel Incorporated Akzo Nobel Inc.'s Notification of Affiliates (Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Chemicals LLC Defendant Nouryon Chemicals LLC's Notification of Affiliates (Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC Defendant Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC's Notification of Affiliates (Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals Defendant Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC's Notification of Affiliates (Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Monsanto (Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Monsanto, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals by Riley C. Mendoza (Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021 L 001405) filed by Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Monsanto, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18110192. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Delaware Certificate, #3 Exhibit 3 - Journal Article, #4 Exhibit 4 - Delaware Certificate of Merger, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Certificate of Amendment, #6 Exhibit 6 - Delaware Certificate of Amendment, #7 Exhibit 7 - Delaware Certificate of Amendment)(Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutledge v. Monsanto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Rutledge
Represented By: Michael Conor Cooney
Represented By: Michael Conor Cooney,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Eric Gordon Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouryan Surface Chemicals
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouryan Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Incorporated
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?