Bennett v. Monsanto et al
Plaintiff: Russell Bennett
Defendant: Monsanto, Nouryan Surface Chemicals, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC and Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03165
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 24 Declaration of Adam Jones in Support of #23 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand Bennett Case filed byMonsanto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMonsanto. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nouryan Surface Chemicals identifying Other Affiliate Carlyle Group, Other Affiliate GIC for Nouryan Surface Chemicals. [Plaintiff Russell Bennett] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC identifying Other Affiliate Carlyle Group, Other Affiliate GIC for Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC. [Plaintiff Russell Bennett] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nouryan Chemicals LLC identifying Other Affiliate Carlyle Group, Other Affiliate GIC for Nouryan Chemicals LLC. [Plaintiff Russell Bennett] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Akzo Nobel Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate Akzo Nobel N.V. for Akzo Nobel Incorporated. [Plaintiff Russell Bennett] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand filed by Russell Bennett. Responses due by 5/28/2021. Replies due by 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Cooney, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01910. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 29, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Northern District of Illinois, 1:21cv01910, Bennett v. Monsanto et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-03165-VC Bennett v. Monsanto et al pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 266 cc: JPMDL (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California the electronic record. (aee, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of California. (aee, )
April 26, 2021 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL (2741) Conditional Transfer Order filed 04/26/2021. (aee, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Russell Bennett to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cooney, Michael)
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Russell Bennett by Michael Conor Cooney (Cooney, Michael)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Chemicals LLC to dismiss Surfactant Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Mendoza, Riley)
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto(O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Monsanto, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals by Riley C. Mendoza (Mendoza, Riley)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nouryan Chemicals LLC Nouryon Chemicals LLC f/k/a Starfruit US Merger Sub 1 LLC, successor in interest to Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC (O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC f/k/a Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC (O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nouryan Surface Chemicals Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC f/k/a Akzo Nobel Surface Chemistry LLC (O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Akzo Nobel Incorporated (O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Monsanto (O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Monsanto, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals by Peter Francis O'Neill (O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, Law Division, case number (2021-L-001412) filed by Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC, Akzo Nobel Incorporated, Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC, Monsanto, Nouryan Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryan Surface Chemicals Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18110267. SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(O'Neill, Peter)
April 9, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Monsanto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Eric Gordon Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouryan Surface Chemicals
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Functional Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouryan Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Incorporated
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouryan Functional Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Surface Chemistry LLC
Represented By: Peter Francis O'Neill
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Bennett
Represented By: John Devitt Cooney
Represented By: Michael Conor Cooney
Represented By: Michael Conor Cooney,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?