Allen v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Richard Allen
Defendant: Archroma U.S. Inc., Dynax Corporation, Chemours Company, The, Tyco Fire Products, LP, Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., Fire Service Plus, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Daikin America, Inc., Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mallory Safety and Supply LLC, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., 3M Company, L.N. Curtis & Sons, Perimeter Solutions, LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment, Lion Group, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Stedfast USA, Inc., PBI Performance Products, Inc., W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Carrier Global Corporation, Arkema Inc., Ten Cate Protective Fabrics doing business as Southern Mills Inc., Allstar Fire Equipment, National Foam, Inc., Municipal Emergency Services Inc., Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Amerex Corporation and Southern Mills, Inc. doing business as Southern Mills Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv03431
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER to the District of South Carolina (MDL 2873) by MDL Panel. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the District of South Carolina. New case number - 2:21-cv-01572. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021) Modified on 5/27/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Municipal Emergency Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MES I Acquisition, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Municipal Emergency Services Inc.. (Defendant Municipal Emergency Services Inc. is 100% owned by MES I Acquisition, Inc., a Delaware corporation) (Kroeger, Shelby) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint byMunicipal Emergency Services Inc.. (Kroeger, Shelby) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ten Cate Protective Fabrics identifying Corporate Parent TenCate Protective Fabrics Holding B.V. for Ten Cate Protective Fabrics. (Kleinman, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ten Cate Protective Fabrics identifying Corporate Parent Ten Cate Protective Fabrics Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Koninklijke Ten Cate B.V., Other Affiliate Tennessee Acquisition B.V., Other Affiliate Tennessee Acquisition Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Tennessee Investment Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Gilde Buy-out Fund IV C.V., Other Affiliate Parcom Tennessee Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Knoxville B.V., Other Affiliate Capital A. Holding V B.V., Other Affiliate Capital A Fund Cooperatief U.A., Other Affiliate Capital A Fund V C.V. for Ten Cate Protective Fabrics. (Kleinman, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Max Kleinman (Kleinman, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perimeter Solutions, LP identifying Corporate Parent Perimeter Solutions North America, Inc. for Perimeter Solutions, LP. (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Perimeter Solutions, LP identifying Corporate Parent Perimeter Solutions North America, Inc. for Perimeter Solutions, LP. (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Thurlow for Perimeter Solutions, LP (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/21/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC-21-590046. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15940586). Filed byTyco Fire Products, LP, 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 5/7/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, LP
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Service Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel D Queen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.N. Curtis & Sons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perimeter Solutions, LP
Represented By: Matthew David Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stedfast USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBI Performance Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Cate Protective Fabrics doing business as Southern Mills Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstar Fire Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
Represented By: Shelby Kathryn Kroeger
Represented By: Matthew J Wiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Mills, Inc. doing business as Southern Mills Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Max Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Allen
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?